Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-15506

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mike K Nakagawa
Case #: 2:19-ap-01115
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2019
Terminated:Oct 20, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA
10412 CHIMNEY FLAT COURT
LAS VEGAS, NV 89129
Represented By
STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA
contact info
Defendant
LORI L. LIPPIA, A MARRIED COUPLE DEALING WITH THEIR INDIVIDUAL AND COMMUNITY PROPERTY
10412 CHIMNEY FLAT COURT
LAS VEGAS, NV 89129
Represented By
LORI L. LIPPIA
contact info
Plaintiff
TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC, AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
3200 NO CENTRAL AVE, STE 2250
PHOENIX, AZ 85012
Represented By
LESLI SORENSEN
Ryan Rapp & Underwood, PLC
contact info
WILLIAM C DEVINE, II
Devine Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
35 35 court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/20 12:24 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (arv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
34 34 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Thu 10/08 9:27 AM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Re: Order Approving Stipultion And Order For Dismissal Of Adversary Case With Prejudice with Certificate of Service Filed by DAVID MINCIN on behalf of LORI L. LIPPIA, STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA Related [+](MINCIN, DAVID)
Related: [-] 31 Stipulated/Agreed Order, Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC).
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf Wed 10/07 10:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 10/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Stipulated/Agreed Order
Monday, October 05, 2020
31 31 orderad Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) Mon 10/05 8:37 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order, Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 30 Stipulation filed by Defendant STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA, Defendant LORI L. LIPPIA.
Friday, October 02, 2020
30 30 adv_misc Stipulation Fri 10/02 9:05 AM
Stipulation By LORI L. LIPPIA, STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA and Between Tresona Multimedia, LLC Filed by DAVID MINCIN on behalf of LORI L. LIPPIA, STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA Related [+] (MINCIN, DAVID)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC.
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
29 29 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Wed 04/22 11:55 AM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 4/22/2020 9:30 AM. Continued. Related [+] Appearances: WILLIAM C DEVINE, DAVID MINCIN, LESLI M.H. SORENSEN Status Hearing to be held on 12/02/2020 at 09:30 AM at MKN-Courtroom 2, Foley Federal Bldg. (cas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC
28 28 adv_misc Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan Wed 04/22 8:59 AM
Discovery Plan Filed by WILLIAM C DEVINE II on behalf of TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC Related [+] (DEVINE, WILLIAM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC.
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
27 27 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Tue 03/17 11:36 AM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Re: Order Approving Stipulation And Order To Continue Adversary Scheduling Conference with Certificate of Service Filed by DAVID MINCIN on behalf of LORI L. LIPPIA, STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA Related [+](MINCIN, DAVID)
Related: [-] 25 Stipulated/Agreed Order.
26 26 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Tue 03/17 9:31 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4/22/2020 at 09:30 AM at MKN-Courtroom 2, Foley Federal Bldg. Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC.
25 25 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order Tue 03/17 9:30 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 24 Stipulation filed by Defendant STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA, Defendant LORI L. LIPPIA.
Monday, March 16, 2020
24 24 adv_misc Stipulation Mon 03/16 2:00 PM
Stipulation By LORI L. LIPPIA, STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA and Between Tresona Multimedia, LLC STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE ADVERSARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Filed by DAVID MINCIN on behalf of LORI L. LIPPIA, STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA Related [+] (MINCIN, DAVID)
Related: [-] 6 Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled (Scheduling Conference).
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/16 1:58 PM
Answer to Complaint Objecting To Discharge Related [+] Filed by DAVID MINCIN on behalf of LORI L. LIPPIA, STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA (MINCIN, DAVID)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf Wed 03/04 10:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Document Forwarded to BNC for Noticing
Monday, March 02, 2020
21 21 court Document Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC-Adv) Mon 03/02 11:25 AM
Clerk Forwarded Document to BNC for Noticing. Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding.
20 20 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/02 11:24 AM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
19 19 adv_misc Errata Tue 01/21 11:33 AM
Errata explaining 'Second Amended' title to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Debtors'/Defendants' Motion to Dismiss with Certificate of Service Filed by WILLIAM C DEVINE II on behalf of TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC Related [+] (DEVINE, WILLIAM)
Related: [-] 17 Response filed by Plaintiff TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC.
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
18 18 answer Reply Wed 01/15 3:24 PM
Reply To Opposition To Motion To Dismiss with Certificate of Service Filed by DAVID MINCIN on behalf of LORI L. LIPPIA, STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA Related [+] (MINCIN, DAVID). Modified on 1/16/2020 to relate to #17 in place of #14 (Youngblood, CL)
Related: [-] 17 Response filed by Plaintiff TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC.
Friday, January 10, 2020
17 17 answer Response Fri 01/10 9:55 AM
Amended Response to Defendants'/Debtors' Motion to Dismiss with Certificate of Service Filed by LESLI M.H. SORENSEN on behalf of TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC (SORENSEN, LESLI)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
16 16 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Fri 12/20 8:40 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 1/22/2020 at 09:30 AM at MKN-Courtroom 2, Foley Federal Bldg. Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA, Defendant LORI L. LIPPIA.
Thursday, December 19, 2019
15 15 notice Hearing (Adv) Thu 12/19 10:23 AM
Notice of Hearing Re: Motion To Dismiss Hearing Date: 1/22/2020 Hearing Time: 9:30 am with Certificate of Service Filed by DAVID MINCIN on behalf of LORI L. LIPPIA, STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA Related [+](MINCIN, DAVID)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA, Defendant LORI L. LIPPIA.
14 14 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 12/19 10:22 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Certificate of Service Filed by DAVID MINCIN on behalf of LORI L. LIPPIA, STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA (MINCIN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
13 13 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 12/10 11:13 AM
Amended Corporate Ownership Statement (to correct reference to Plaintiff's Parent Company) (to correct reference to Plaintiff's Parent Company) Filed by WILLIAM C DEVINE II on behalf of TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC (DEVINE, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
12 12 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 12/09 9:28 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Corporate parents added to case: Greenbooth LLC. Filed by WILLIAM C DEVINE II on behalf of TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC (DEVINE, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/05 10:06 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Approving Verified Petition
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
10 10 orderad Approving Verified Petition (Adv) Tue 12/03 10:48 AM
Amended Order Approving Verified Petition Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 4 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiff TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC, Designation of Local Counsel.
Thursday, November 28, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/28 10:00 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/28/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Approving Verified Petition
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
8 8 orderad Approving Verified Petition (Adv) Tue 11/26 10:15 AM
Order Approving Verified Petition Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 4 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiff TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC, Designation of Local Counsel.
7 7 court Summons Issued Tue 11/26 10:03 AM
Summons Issued on LORI L. LIPPIA , STEVEN THOMAS LIPPIA (arv)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Tue 11/26 10:03 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4/9/2020 at 10:00 AM at MKN-Courtroom 2, Foley Federal Bldg. Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC.
Monday, November 25, 2019
5 5 crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Mon 11/25 5:41 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice 19-01115 mkn) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number 19238552, fee amount $ 250.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#4
4 4 adv_misc|misc Designation of Local Counsel (Adv)|Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 5:39 PM
Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Fee Amount $250., Designation of Local Counsel VP Follow-up Date 12/9/2019 Filed by WILLIAM C DEVINE II, Lesli Sorensen on behalf of TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC (DEVINE, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Request to Issue Summons Mon 11/25 5:31 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: LORI L. ANDERSEN-LIPPIA, STEVEN T. LIPPIA. Filed by WILLIAM C DEVINE II on behalf of TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC (DEVINE, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Mon 11/25 5:29 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 19-01115 mkn) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 19238537, fee amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 5:27 PM
Adversary case 19-01115 Complaint Filed by TRESONA MULTIMEDIA, LLC vs. STEVEN T. LIPPIA, LORI L. ANDERSEN-LIPPIA Fee Amount $350. (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)(DEVINE, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-11