Tipton v. 3B Inspection, LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark Pittman |
Case #: | 4:19-cv-01003 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 30, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday May 25, 2020 3:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
3B Inspection, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Tipton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
![]() FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's Order (ECF No.39 ) issued this date, the Court finds it appropriate to issue this Final Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Therefore, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/29/2021) (pef) |
|
39 | 39
![]() ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff Amy Tipton's Motion to File Under Seal (ECF No.36 ) and the parties' Joint Motion to Approve Settlement and for Dismissal with Prejudice (ECF No.38 ). Having considered the Motion to File Under Seal, the Court finds that it should be and hereby is GRANTED. Having considered the Joint Motion to Approve Settlement, the Court finds that it should be and hereby is GRANTED and the case DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/29/2021) (pef) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
![]() MOTION Approval of FLSA Settlement filed by Amy Tipton with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
37 | 37
![]() (Document Restricted) Sealed Confidential Settlement Agreement (Sealed pursuant to order dated 12/1/2020) filed by Amy Tipton (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
36 | 36
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by Amy Tipton (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
![]() ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to file Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and for Dismissal with Prejudice. ECF No.34 . Having considered the Joint Motion, the Court finds that it should be and hereby is GRANTED. Therefore, the parties are ORDERED to submit to the Court, under seal if necessary, on or before January 13, 2021, a joint motion for approval of settlement and for dismissal with prejudice. The Clerk of this Court is DIRECTED to administratively close this case and remove it from the statistical records. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/30/2020) (pef) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by 3B Inspection, LLC (Devine, Corey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ORDER: The Court has been notified that this case has settled. ECF No.32 . The parties are ORDERED to submit to the Court, under seal if necessary, on or before December 30, 2020, a joint motion for approval of settlement and for dismissal with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/1/2020) (pef) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Beatriz Sosa-Morris, Corey E. Devine. Prv Fee: $ 1,500.00 per side. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (McMullen, Wade) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
![]() ORDER: Having considered the30 Joint Report, the Court finds that the request for extension of the mediation deadline should be and is hereby GRANTED, and the request for the appointment of a new mediator should be and is hereby is DENIED. Therefore, it is ORDERED that the parties shall mediate with Wade H. McMullen on or before December 1, 2020, and subsequently file a joint report as provided in paragraph 5 of the Scheduling Order (ECF No.17 ). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/1/2020) (pef) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Amended Mediation Deadline filed by 3B Inspection, LLC. (Devine, Corey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
![]() NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Chance Newhart; William Young on 8/9/2020; 8/8/2020. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by William dela Houssaye on 7/25/2020. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Designation of Experts by 3B Inspection, LLC. (Devine, Corey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
![]() NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by John McDonald; David Schramm; Christopher Potter on 7/15/2020; 7/25/2020; 7/28/2020. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
![]() NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Charles Duff on 07/25/2020. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Courtney Lynn Sauer on behalf of 3B Inspection, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sauer, Courtney) |
|
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Sergio Loyola on 7/15/2020. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
![]() NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by David Coppedge on 6/30/2020. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by William Quinn on 6/20/2020. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Mickey Lewis; Travis Cramer on 6/12/2020. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING NOTICE TO POTENTIAL COLLECTIVE MEMBERS: Before the Court is the Parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Notice to Potential Collective Members ("Joint Stipulation"), filed May 21, 2020. See ECF No.18 . The Parties stipulate that all discovery shall be stayed during the pendency of the opt-in period in order to allow the Parties to construct a discovery plan after the number of individuals that join this case is determined. The Court cancels the current August 14, 2020 deadline for mediation and the associated joint written report on mediation. Having considered these Joint Stipulations, the Court finds that they should be and hereby are APPROVED. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/26/2020) (pef) |
|
Thursday, May 21, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Joint STIPULATION Regarding Notice to Potential Collective Members by Amy Tipton. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning June 14, 2021. Joinder of Parties due by 5/11/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2020. Motions due by 3/11/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/14/2020. Discovery due by 2/9/2021. Pretrial Order due by 4/22/2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/12/2020) (pef) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Amy Tipton. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/07 9:44 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Corey Devine. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/7/2020) (chmb)(cpb) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10600822) filed by 3B Inspection, LLCAttorney Corey Devine added to party 3B Inspection, LLC(pty:dft) (Devine, Corey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() Order Requiring Scheduling Conference and Report for Contents of Scheduling Order...Lead counsel for each party shall confer no later than March 6, 2020...Joint Report due by 3/13/2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/6/2020) (wrb) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3B Inspection, LLC. (Sharp, Devon) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by 3B Inspection, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Sharp, Devon) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer 3B Inspection, LLC answer due 2/5/2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/22/2020) (wrb) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by 3B Inspection, LLC Attorney Devon D Sharp added to party 3B Inspection, LLC(pty:dft) (Sharp, Devon) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meredith Mathews on behalf of Amy Tipton. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mathews, Meredith) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER denying6 Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/6/2019) (tln) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Amy Tipton (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wrb) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to 3B Inspection, LLC. (wrb) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/2/2019) (wrb) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amy Tipton. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Amy Tipton. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against 3B Inspection, LLC filed by Amy Tipton. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10442820) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sosa-Morris, Beatriz) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |