Saidak v. Schmidt
Tennessee Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon P Mccalla |
Referred: | Debra C Poplin |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00487 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 09, 2021 1:48 PM EST |
Counter Claimant
Michael Schmidt
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
trumpet of the Lord
935 Foxfire Drive
Lawrenceville, GA 30044 |
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Derek Saidak
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Schmidt
935 Foxfire Drive
Lawrenceville, GA 30044 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
trumpet of the Lord
935 Foxfire Drive
Lawrenceville, GA 30044 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derek Saidak
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
111 | 111
![]() JUDGMENT re 110 Order on Motion for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement. Signed by District Judge Jon P McCalla on 7/22/201. (pa) |
|
110 | 110
![]() ORDER of DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Jon P McCalla on 7/22/2021. (pa) |
|
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
109 | 109
![]() MOTION for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement by Derek Saidak. (Martin, Christopher) |