Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12560

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:19-ap-50940
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2019
Terminated:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Roger L. Owens
Represented By
Roger L. Owens
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer M. Lepore
Represented By
Jennifer M. Lepore
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Goldberg, in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust
Represented By
Bradford J. Sandler
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Andrew Caine
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 15, 2021
33 33 misc Status Report Mon 03/15 11:41 PM
Status Report /Omnibus Mediation Status Report Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/05 9:04 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/05 12:04 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50940 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
31 31 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Mon 02/01 2:18 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 04/5/2021. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
30 30 mediation Mediation Status Report Thu 01/14 3:21 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
29 29 misc Status Report Mon 01/04 5:01 PM
Status Report with Respect to Certain Adversary Matters Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 08, 2020
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 11/09 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/08/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27
Friday, November 06, 2020
27 27 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Fri 11/06 11:48 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 1/5/2021. Signed on 11/6/2020. (SJS)
Related: [-] 26
Thursday, November 05, 2020
26 26 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Thu 11/05 11:27 AM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Liquidating Trustee and Defendants . Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
25 25 misc Status Report Tue 11/03 4:27 PM
Status Report with Respect to Certain Adversary Matters Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
24 24 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 10/09 10:44 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service to amend an Affidavit of Service . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Bowdler, Angharad)
Related: [-] 23
Friday, October 02, 2020
23 23 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 10/02 10:47 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Scheduling Order . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Gallerie, Bridget)
Related: [-] 22
Friday, September 04, 2020
22 22 order Scheduling Order Fri 09/04 10:22 AM
Scheduling Order Signed on 9/3/2020 The case judge is Brendan Linehan Shannon. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
21 21 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 09/02 6:46 PM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
20 20 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 08/14 12:59 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Agenda and Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing on August 5th, 2020 at 9:30 A.M . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 18 ,19
Monday, August 03, 2020
19 19 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Mon 08/03 2:00 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 8/5/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Mon 08/03 12:14 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 8/5/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
17 17 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 07/10 3:00 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Re: Notice of Agenda and Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing on June 24, 2020 at 9:00 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Gallerie, Bridget)
Related: [-] 15 ,16
Monday, June 22, 2020
16 16 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 06/22 3:22 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2020 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Mon 06/22 12:41 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2020 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
14 14 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Tue 06/09 11:43 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Agenda and Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing on May 27, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Persichilli, Susan)
Related: [-] 12 ,13
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 05/26 2:10 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Fri 05/22 12:28 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
11 11 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 05/01 5:24 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service RE: [HEARING CANCELLED] Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 22, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Related [+] Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Gallerie, Bridget)
Related: [-] 9
Sunday, April 26, 2020
10 10 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Sun 04/26 1:30 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service RE: [CANCELLED HEARING] Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 18, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Related [+] Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Staal, Lorri)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, April 20, 2020
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 04/20 12:08 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Michael Goldberg, Woodbridge Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 4/22/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
8 8 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 03/19 5:44 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for February 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time); and Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for February 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Related [+] Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Staal, Lorri)
Related: [-] 5 ,6
Monday, March 16, 2020
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 03/16 3:57 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2020 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 02/10 10:57 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Michael Goldberg, Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, Woodbridge Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 02/07 11:41 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Michael Goldberg, Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, Woodbridge Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2019
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/19 7:50 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Jennifer M. Lepore, Roger L. Owens Mediation due date: 04/17/2020.(Joyce, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Saturday, November 30, 2019
3 3 crditcrd none Sat 11/30 10:17 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50940 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9544262, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2019
2 2 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/27 1:36 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Jennifer M. Lepore, Roger L. Owens. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/27/2020. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 11/27 1:33 PM
Adversary case 19-50940 Complaint Objecting to Claims and Counterclaiming for Avoidance and Recovery of Avoidable Transfers, for Equitable Subordination, for Sale of Unregistered Securities, Fraud, and for Aiding and Abetting Fraud by Michael Goldberg against Roger L. Owens, Jennifer M. Lepore. Fee Amount $350 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-3