Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12560

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:19-ap-51023
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2019
Terminated:Oct 21, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Safe Money Broadcasting, LLC
Represented By
Safe Money Broadcasting, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael P. Litwin
Represented By
Michael P. Litwin
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Goldberg, in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust
Represented By
Andrew W. Caine
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Bradford J. Sandler
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
60 60 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Tue 10/26 9:33 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Respect to Defendant Michael P. Litwin . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Gallerie, Bridget)
Related: [-] 59
Thursday, October 21, 2021
59 59 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/21 8:58 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Respect to Defendent Michael P. Litwin Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
58 58 notice Withdrawal - Notice Thu 10/21 8:55 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Docket No. 57 - wrong attachment filed in error. Related [+] Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 57
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/21 12:57 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-51023 Closed (ATo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
57 57 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/20 3:09 PM
[WITHDRAWN - See Docket No. 58] Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Respect to Defendent Michael P. Litwin Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin) Modified on 10/21/2021 (MD)
Related: [-]