Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:19-cr-00119
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2019
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2019 9:21 PM HST
Defendant
Shi Min Huang (4)
Represented By
Andrew M. Kennedy
Schlueter, Kwiat & Kennedy Lllp
contact info
Salina Kanai Althof
The Law Office Of Salina Kanai Althof
contact info
Defendant
Jason Ishizuka (1)
Represented By
Alexander Silvert
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Maximilian J. Mizono
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Seng Long Lio (3)
Represented By
Randall K. Hironaka
Miyoshi & Hironaka Lllc
contact info
Defendant
Freddy Siatunuu (6)
Represented By
Cynthia A. Kagiwada
contact info
Michael Jay Green
contact info
Alvin P.K.K. Nishimura
contact info
Defendant
Aiyan Zhang (2)
Represented By
Clarence McCurdy Virtue
Cary Virtue, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Alex Hui Zhang (5)
Represented By
Myles S. Breiner
Law Offices Of Myles S. Breiner
contact info
Richard D. Gronna
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Micah W. J. Smith
U.S. Attorney'S Office, District Of Hawaii
contact info
Sara D. Ayabe
Office Of The United States Attorney-Honolulu
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/02/2019 9:41 PM HST
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Jason Ishizuka (1) count(s) 1, Aiyan Zhang (2) count(s) 1, Seng Long Lio (3) count(s) 1, Shi Min Huang (4) count(s) 1, Alex Hui Zhang (5) count(s) 1, Freddy Siatunuu (6) count(s) 1, 2. (jo) Modified on 9/17/2019 to unseal Indictment pursuant to ECF 9 (jo)
Related: [-]