Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:19-cv-07871
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2019
Case in other court:Missouri Eastern, 4:19-cv-02387
Last checked: Sunday May 31, 2020 4:03 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Eric G. Lasker
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Allen Holden
Represented By
Kirk John Goza
Goza Honnold Trial Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 01/15 7:56 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 01/15 7:54 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/15 7:51 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 12/03 8:14 AM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02387. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Tue 12/03 8:28 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Missouri Eastern, 4:19-cv-02387, Holden v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07871-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 168 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
3 3 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
2 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-168) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7414350, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Allen Holden.(Goza, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form,
Att: 3 Attachment,
Att: 4 Waiver of Service
Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (JWD)
Related: [-]