Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence G Berg
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:19-cv-13560
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2019
Terminated:Dec 12, 2019
Case in other court:35th Judicial Court, Plymouth Michigan, 19-c-12937
Last checked: Sunday May 31, 2020 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Jeric M Thomas
Represented By
James J. Carty
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Edmi
contact info
Plaintiff
Township of Canton
Represented By
Gregory D. Demopoulos
Amann, Demopoulous,
contact info

GPO Dec 05 2019
ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, December 12, 2019
5 5 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Thu 12/12 4:14 PM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
4 4 notice Appear* Tue 12/10 12:57 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2019
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/06 9:48 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Jeric M Thomas. (Carty, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
2 2 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/05 3:59 PM
ORDER re1 Notice of Removal. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Tue 12/03 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeric M Thomas from 35th Judicial District, Canton MI, case number 19-c-12937. No Fee Required - US Government. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Carty, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Certification of Scope of Employment,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Notice to Appear
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Tue 12/03 1:42 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (NAhm)
Related: [-]