Salon Rebelle LLC et al v. Ultimate Brands Inc et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-12516
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-12516
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Theodor Albert |
Case #: | 8:19-ap-01227 |
Nature of Suit | 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e) 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ultimate Brands Inc, a California Corporation
30821 Seminole Pl
Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ultimate Franchises Inc
30821 Seminole Pl
Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Scott Griffiths
30821 Seminole Pl
Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Loretta Hwong Griffiths
30821 Seminole Pl
Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ron Love
2028 N Victoria Dr
Santa Ana, CA 92706 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dianne Davis
2028 N. Victoria Drive
Santa Ana, CA 92706 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Salon Rebelle Inc, a California Corporation (Nominal Defendant)
127 S Olive St
Orange, CA 92866 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salon Rebelle LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
127 S Olive St
Orange, CA 92866 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcos Trujillo
1618 S Woodland Place
Santa Ana, CA 92706 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Aguiar-Gutierrez
720 W Burnett Street
Long Beach, CA 90806 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vicky Garza
2004 Greenleaf Street
Santa Ana, CA 92706 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darryl Vergolino-Holiday
1415 E Palm Avenue
Orange, CA 92866 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SALON REBELLE, INC., a California Corporation
127 S Olive St
Orange, CA 92866 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 06/03 11:15 AM
Adversary Case 8:19-ap-1227 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
Sunday, February 23, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sun 02/23 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 02/23/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Fri 02/21 4:06 PM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding For Failure To Prosecute (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/21/2020. THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED TAHT THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING 8:19-AP-01227 TA IS DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Thu 02/20 6:49 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Other) - DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. COURT TO PREPARE ORDER (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 12/03 2:27 PM
Summons Issued on Dianne Davis Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020; Loretta Hwong Griffiths Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020; William Scott Griffiths Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020; Ron Love Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020; Salon Rebelle Inc Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020; Ultimate Brands Inc Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020; Ultimate Franchises Inc Date Issued 12/3/2019, Answer Due 1/2/2020 Status hearing to be held on 2/20/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Errata
Tue 12/03 11:03 AM
Errata and Submission of Exhibit A to Complaint Filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Aguiar-Gutierrez, Vicky Garza, SALON REBELLE, INC., SALON REBELLE, LLC, Marcos Trujillo, Darryl Vergolino-Holiday . (Garcia, Norma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/03 8:18 AM
Adversary case 8:19-ap-01227. Complaint by SALON REBELLE, LLC, Marcos Trujillo, Elizabeth Aguiar-Gutierrez, Vicky Garza, Darryl Vergolino-Holiday, SALON REBELLE, INC. against Ultimate Brands Inc, Ultimate Franchises, Inc. dba 18|8 Fine Men's Salons, William Scott Griffiths, Loretta Hwong Griffiths, Ron Love, Dianne Davis, SALON REBELLE, INC.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Garcia, Norma) |