Arizona District Court
Judge:Douglas L Rayes
Case #: 2:19-cv-05720
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2019
Terminated:Aug 06, 2020
Last checked: Sunday May 31, 2020 3:47 AM MST
Defendant
ADS Foods LLC
Plaintiff
Jessica Kooi
Represented By
Michael David Zoldan
Zoldan Law Group PLLC
contact info
Jessica Elizabeth Miller
Zoldan Law Group PLLC
contact info

GPO Aug 06 2020
ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for default judgment 16 is GRANTED. Default judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $60,483.20 plus backpay prejudgment interest at a rate of 1.3%. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in accordance with this order and terminate this case. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/06/2020. (REK)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, February 13, 2023
26 26 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 02/13 12:23 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:24 Clerks Judgment, by Jessica Kooi. (Barrat, Jason)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney) Mon 02/13 12:22 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Jason Saul Barrat. (Barrat, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
24 24 order Clerks Judgment Thu 08/06 5:12 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon instruction by the Court, default judgment is hereby entered against Defendant ADS Foods LLC in the amount of $60,483.20 plus backpay prejudgment interest at a rate of 1.3%. (REK)
Related: [-]
23 23 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 08/06 5:09 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for default judgment16 is GRANTED. Default judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $60,483.20 plus backpay prejudgment interest at a rate of 1.3%. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in accordance with this order and terminate this case. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/06/2020. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
22 22 motion Supplement Thu 07/23 11:44 AM
MOTION to Supplement Brief RE Punitive Damages by Jessica Kooi. (Miller, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
21 21 trial Witness List Tue 07/21 1:24 PM
Witness List by Jessica Kooi. (MMO)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Evidentiary Hearing 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Tue 07/21 12:06 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Evidentiary Hearing re:16 Motion for Default Judgment held on 7/21/2020. Evidence entered. Counsel for plaintiff shall submit supplemental memo regarding the standard and the elements of proof for an award of punitive damages by noon, Friday, 7/24/2020. Motion16 under advisement. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jessica Miller for Plaintiff. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 11:01 AM to 11:55 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
19 19 minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Tue 07/14 12:08 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephone Conference held on 7/14/2020. Evidentiary Hearing re:16 Motion for Default Judgment set for 7/21/2020 at 11:00AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This hearing is set for 30 minutes and will be held telephonically. Counsel will be provided with call-in information via separate email. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jessica Miller for Plaintiff. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 11:14 AM to 11:18 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
18 18 order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 07/07 3:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Telephone Conference re: evidentiary hearing set for 7/14/2020 at 11:15 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Counsel will be provided with call-in information via separate email. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/16 9:32 AM
NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Dkt. 16 by Jessica Kooi re:16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to ADS Foods, LLC d/b/a KFC . (Miller, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
16 16 motion Default Judgment Mon 06/15 2:56 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to ADS Foods, LLC d/b/a KFC by Jessica Kooi.(Miller, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 05, 2020
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 06/05 3:33 PM
ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate this case without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/5/2020. (MMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 03/04 1:46 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ADS Foods LLC - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendant ADS Foods LLC d/b/a KFC. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
13 13 misc Application for Entry of Default Tue 03/03 3:05 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Jessica Kooi against ADS Foods, LLC d/b/a/ KFC.(Miller, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/26 11:08 AM
ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Defendant ADS Foods LLC, only, without further order of the Court, if Plaintiff fails to file either a status report or an application for entry of default within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/25/2020. (MMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
11 11 service Service Executed Wed 02/12 9:15 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Kooi: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons upon David H. Wehrman on 02/08/2020. (Miller, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
10 10 service Service Executed Mon 02/10 11:27 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Kooi: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons upon David H. Wehrman on 7/8/2020. (Miller, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 02/07 2:00 PM
Summons Issued as to ADS Foods LLC. (SST)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 02/07 1:40 PM
ORDER that if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action after 3/5/2020, for Plaintiff's lack of service pursuant to Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/6/2020. (MMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
7 7 service Summons Submitted Fri 01/17 2:27 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Jessica Kooi. (Miller, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
6 6 3 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Wed 12/04 1:55 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/3/2019. (MMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 12/03 2:46 PM
Summons Issued as to ADS Foods LLC. (MCO)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Tue 12/03 2:44 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 12/03 2:43 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17693034. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-5720 PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Tue 12/03 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Jessica Kooi.. (Miller, Jessica) (MCO)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/03 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17693034 filed by Jessica Kooi. (Miller, Jessica)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet