Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-04873
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2019
Last checked: Monday Jun 01, 2020 5:19 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
KEMMONS CURRY
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 06, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/06 8:32 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/04 9:46 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4726101.), filed by KEMMONS CURRY. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons