Goldberg v. Martin
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12560
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12560
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-51144 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Kevin Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Goldberg, as Liquidating Trustee of the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust, successor in interest to the estates of Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 04, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/04 4:32 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-51144 Closed (MD) |
||
Monday, December 27, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Judgment by Default . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Gallerie, Bridget) |
|
Wednesday, December 22, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/22/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 20, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Default Judgment Against Defendant Kevin Martin. . Signed on 12/20/2021. (SJM) |
|
28 | 28
![]() Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 19, 2021 at 9:00 AM (Prevailing Eastern Time) before the Honorable J. Kate Stickles . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Gallerie, Bridget) |
|
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Liquidation Trusts Status Report for May 19, 2021 Status Conference . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Gallerie, Bridget) |
|
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Michael Goldberg. Hearing scheduled for 5/19/2021 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Order . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Gallerie, Bridget) |
|
Wednesday, May 05, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Status Report Liquidation Trust's Status Report for May 19, 2021 Status Conference Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Order Requiring Omnibus Status Report Addressing Each Pending Adversary Proceeding Signed on 4/13/2021 (MD) |
|
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Janet Kathleen Stickles added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (SH) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Entry of Default Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Gallerie, Bridget) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service Re: Notice of Agenda and Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing on June 24, 2020 at 9:00 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Gallerie, Bridget) |
|
Saturday, July 04, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 07/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default against defendant Kevin Martin . Signed on 7/2/2020. (SJS) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Request for Entry of Default Filed by Michael Goldberg. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2020 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2020 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service e Notice of Agenda and Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing on May 27, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Gallerie, Bridget) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service RE: [HEARING CANCELLED] Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 22, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Gallerie, Bridget) |
|
Sunday, April 26, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service RE: [CANCELLED HEARING] Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 18, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Staal, Lorri) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Michael Goldberg, Woodbridge Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 4/22/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for February 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time); and Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for February 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Staal, Lorri) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2020 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Michael Goldberg, Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, Woodbridge Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Michael Goldberg, Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, Woodbridge Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 12/05 3:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-51144 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9552696, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Kevin Martin. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/3/2020. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-51144 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Fraudulent Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 544, 548 & 550 by Michael Goldberg against Kevin Martin. Fee Amount $350 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |