Sherry Walker v. Children's Hospital of Wiscons
Original Case: 2:17-cv-00583
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03385 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 14, 2020 3:34 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF WISCONSIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHERRY WALKER
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 13 2020
Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. [7074317-1] [7074317] [19-3385] |
Docket last updated: 04/14/2020 3:29 AM CDT |
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 12/17/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Sherry Walker by 12/10/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 01/13/2020 for Sherry Walker [1] [7047706] 19-3385 (FP) [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:02 AM] | |
Att: 1 19 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |