Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:19-cv-00395
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 03, 2020 3:26 AM CDT
Consol Counter Defendant
Luminati Networks Ltd.
Represented By
Elizabeth L DeRieux
Capshaw Derieux LLP
contact info
Ronald Wielkopolski
Ruyakcherian LLP
contact info
Korula T Cherian
Ruyakcherian Llp - Berkley
contact info
Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Capshaw Derieux LLP
contact info
Robert M Harkins, Jr
Ruyakcherian Llp - Berkley
contact info
Amadou Kilkenny Diaw
Ruyakcherian LLP
contact info
James Mark Mann
Mann Tindel & Thompson
contact info
Counter Defendant
EMK Capital Partners GP Co-Investment LP
Counter Defendant
EMK Capital Partners LP
Counter Defendant
EMK Capital, LLP
Counter Defendant
Hola Networks Ltd.,
Counter Defendant
Hola VPN Ltd.,
Defendant
Teso LT, UAB
Represented By
Craig N Tolliver
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Steven Chase Callahan
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Michael Charles Smith
Siebman Burg Phillips & Smith, Llp-Marshall
contact info
George T Scott
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Defendant
metacluster lt, UAB
Represented By
Craig N Tolliver
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Steven Chase Callahan
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Michael Charles Smith
Siebman Burg Phillips & Smith, Llp-Marshall
contact info
George T Scott
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Defendant
oxysales, UAB
Represented By
Craig N Tolliver
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Steven Chase Callahan
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Michael Charles Smith
Siebman Burg Phillips & Smith, Llp-Marshall
contact info
George T Scott
Charhon, Callahan, Robson & Garza PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Luminati Networks Ltd.
Represented By
Elizabeth L DeRieux
Capshaw Derieux LLP
contact info
Ronald Wielkopolski
Ruyakcherian LLP
contact info
Gregory Blake Thompson
Mann Tindel & Thompson
contact info
Korula T Cherian
Ruyakcherian Llp - Berkley
contact info
Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Capshaw Derieux LLP
contact info
Robert M Harkins, Jr
Ruyakcherian Llp - Berkley
contact info
James Mark Mann
Mann Tindel & Thompson
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Consol Counter Claimant
BI Science (2009) Ltd.
Terminated: 05/21/2020
Represented By
Eric Hugh Findlay
Findlay Craft PC
contact info
Consol Defendant
BI Science (2009) Ltd.
Terminated: 05/21/2020
Represented By
Eric Hugh Findlay
Findlay Craft PC
contact info

GPO Dec 07 2020
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/7/2020. (ch, )
GPO Feb 16 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 210 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) and 35 U.S.C. § 101. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/21. (ch, )

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
644 644 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/27 4:43 PM
NOTICE by oxysales, UAB (Oxylabs' Notice of Patent Office Activity -'319 and '510 Patents)(Callahan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B