Hassel v. Centric Bank et al
Pennsylvania Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer P Wilson |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-02081 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Jan 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 03, 2020 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Centric Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tans Union, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan S. Hassel
4000 Schoolhouse Lane
Harrisburg, PA 17109 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
93 | 93
![]() ORDER granting91 Notice filed by Trans Union, LLC. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/15/2023. (ve) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2023 | ||
92 | 92
![]() MOTION for Order Granting Statement Of Attorney's Fees [Doc. 91] by Trans Union, LLC.(Brady, Scott) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 02/14 12:22 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Defense counsel is advised to file a proposed order for the Notice filed at Doc. 91. (ve) |