U.S. Court of Federal Claims
Judge:Patricia E Campbell-Smith
Case #: 1:19-cv-01796
Nature of Suit138
Cause28:1491 Tucker Act
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2019
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2020 4:33 AM EST
Defendant
USA
Represented By
Anthony Francis Schiavetti
U.S. Department Of Justice - Civil Division
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
MICROSOFT CORP.
Represented By
Robert S. Metzger
Rogers Joseph O Donnell, Pc (dc)
contact info
Plaintiff
AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
Kevin Patrick Mullen
Morrison & Foerster, Llp (dc)
contact info

Docket last updated: 04/03/2020 6:42 PM EDT
Friday, November 22, 2019
1 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) (Filing fee $400, Receipt number AUSFCC-5808209) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC. Answer due by 1/21/2020. (jt1)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jt1)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (jt1)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Intervene , filed by MICROSOFT CORP. Response due by 12/6/2019. (Chiow, Jeffery) Modified on 11/22/2019 to correct the filer. (dls).
Related: [-]
5 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC.. (jt1)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [18-1880C], filed by AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC. (jt1)
Related: [-]
7 7 **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record - Rule 15(d) re:, filed by AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC. Response due by 12/6/2019.(jt1) (jt1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support,
Att: 2 Appendix
Att: 3 (11/25/2019) Exhibit
8 8 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, filed by AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC. Response due by 12/6/2019. (jt1)
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC. Response due by 12/6/2019. (jt1)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc, filed by AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC. (jt1)
Related: [-]
11 11 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC. Redaction of1 Complaint FILED UNDER SEAL. (jt1)
Related: [-]
12 12 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC. Redaction of7 MOTION to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) FILED UNDER SEAL.(jt1) (jt1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support
Att: 2 (11/25/2019) Exhibit