Carr v. Elliott et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46116 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Northern, 3:19-cv-00246 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 16, 2019 1:02 PM EST |
Defendant
John Does #1-10
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Marshall Hollis
|
|
Defendant
Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo International PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charles Elliott, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Akorn, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Carr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/16/2019 12:59 PM EST |
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. from CV2019-075, case number Circuit Court of Tippah County, Mississippi. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1736727) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally. , filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc.. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 State Court Record, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 21 pgs STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Akorn, Inc., Charles Elliott, MD, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc., Marshall Hollis, Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc., John Does 1-10, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., filed by Gary Carr. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
3 | 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/6/19. (rtc) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT Disclosure . (Thomas, Stephen) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
5 | 5 CORPORATE STATEMENT Disclosure . (Thomas, Stephen) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
6 | 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Thomas, Stephen) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
7 | 7 ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/12/19. (bnd) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Thomas, Stephen) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Docket, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Complaint Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance with Miss. Code Ann., | ||
Att: 4 State Court Complaint First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Appearance-J.Upchurch, L.Carmody & J.McIntosh, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Defendants Charles Elliott, M.D. and Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.'s Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Separate Answer and Defenses of Charles Elliott, M.D. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Separate Answer and Defenses of Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Summons - Activis Pharma, Inc. c/o Corporate Creation Network, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Summons Summons - Akorn, Inc. c/o Corporate Service Company, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Summons - Endo Health Solution, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Summons - Hi-Tech Pharmacal Company c/o Corporate Service Company, | ||
Att: 13 Summons Summons - HollisDiscount Pharmacy, Inc. c/o Jim Tucker, | ||
Att: 14 Summons Summons - Mallinckrodt LLC c/o The Corporation Trust Company, | ||
Att: 15 Summons Summons - Marshall Hollis, | ||
Att: 16 Summons Summons - Par Pharmaceutical Companies c/o The Corporation Trust Company, | ||
Att: 17 Summons Summons - Par PHarmaceutical, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System, | ||
Att: 18 Summons Summons - Purdue Pharma L.P. c/o Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., | ||
Att: 19 Summons Summons - Purdue Pharma, Inc. c/o United Corporate Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 20 Summons Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. c/o Corporate Creation Network, Inc., | ||
Att: 21 Summons Summons - The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. c/o The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit Agreed Order Extending Time to Service Process, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Charles Elliott, M.D. and Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.'s Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 25 Summons Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company, | ||
Att: 26 Summons Summons Issued - Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A. c/o Troy R. Cappleman, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit Separate Amended Answer and Defenses of Charles Elliott, M.D. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit Separate Amended Answer and Defenses of Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit Notice of Appearance - A.Harris, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit Notice of Appearance - L.Reppeto, | ||
Att: 31 Summons Endo Health Solutions, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trsut Company, | ||
Att: 32 Summons Summons - Purdue Frederick Company c/o Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit Charles Elliott, M.D. and Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A."s Supplemental Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit Charles Elliott, M.D.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit Charles Elliott, M.D. and Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.'s Motion to Alter or Amend Order Extending Time to Serve Process, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit Notice of Suggestion of Bankrupcty and Automatic Stay of Proceedings and Notice of Preliminary Injunction Order, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal | ||
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Halbert, Mark) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
10 | 10 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Halbert, Mark) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
11 | 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part9 Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part and denying in part10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/25/19. (bnd) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Friday, November 29, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Maron, David) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/3/19. (bnd) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
14 | 14 NOTICE by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. of Conditional Transfer Order (Thomas, Stephen) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Conditional Transfer Order | ||
15 | 15 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Northern. Case number 3:19-cv-00246. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |