Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Louis Guirola, Jr
Referred: Robert H Walker
Case #: 1:19-cv-00937
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2019
Terminated:Mar 30, 2020
Case in other court:Chancery Court of Jackson County, Mississippi, 30CH1:19cv01879-TLH
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 03, 2020 3:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By
Simon T. Bailey
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Stephen Lee Thomas
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Simon T. Bailey
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Stephen Lee Thomas
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Jaclyn P. Gatling
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Meyer
Burr & Forman, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Nathan C. Grace
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Meyer
Burr & Forman, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By
J. Patrick Strubel
Watkins & Eager, Pllc - Birmingham
contact info
Corey D. Hinshaw
Watkins & Eager, Pllc - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Henry Schein, Inc.
Defendant
JM Smith Corporation
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By
W. Thomas McCraney, III
Mccraney Montagnet & Quin, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership II
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
Defendant
Leslie Roberson
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Meyer
Burr & Forman, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By
J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Mayo Mallette PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By
Simon T. Bailey
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Stephen Lee Thomas
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Actavis, LLC
Represented By
Simon T. Bailey
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Stephen Lee Thomas
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By
Leo J. Carmody, Jr.
Upchurch & Upchurch, Pa - Oxford
contact info
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By
Thomas W. Tardy, III
Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC
contact info
Edderek Linnel Cole
Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
William P Symmes
Symmes & Estes, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
Represented By
Simon T. Bailey
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Stephen Lee Thomas
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Walgreen Co., Inc.
Represented By
Leo J. Carmody, Jr.
Upchurch & Upchurch, Pa - Oxford
contact info
Defendant
Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By
Courtney Choi Hunt
Forman Watkins & Krutz, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By
Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Wells, Marble & Hurst, Pllc - Ridgeland
contact info
Dorissa S. Smith
Wells, Marble & Hurst, Pllc - Ridgeland
contact info
Thomas M. Louis
Wells, Marble & Hurst, Pllc - Ridgeland
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By
Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Wells, Marble & Hurst, Pllc - Ridgeland
contact info
Dorissa S. Smith
Wells, Marble & Hurst, Pllc - Ridgeland
contact info
Thomas M. Louis
Wells, Marble & Hurst, Pllc - Ridgeland
contact info
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Represented By
J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Mayo Mallette PLLC
contact info
Defendant
CVS Indiana, LLC
Represented By
J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Mayo Mallette PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wesley Health System, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
ROH, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
River Oaks Hospital, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Singing River Health System
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Tippah County Hospital
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Progressive Medical Management of Bates Ville
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
North Sunflower Medical Center
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Natchez Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Memorial Hospital at Gulfport
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Magnolia Regional Health Center
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Madison HMA, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Jackson HMA, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Field Memorial Community Hospital
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Delta Regional Medical Center
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Clarksdale HMA, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon HMA, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Boa Vida Hospital of Aberdeen, MS, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Biloxi HMA, LLC
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Anderson Regional Health System
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Healthcare System
Represented By
John W. Barrett
Don Barrett, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, March 30, 2020
38 38 utility Remark Mon 03/30 1:54 PM
Confirmation of case transferred and opened in the Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45127, filed 3/30/2020. (wld)
Related: [-]
37 37 utility Remark Mon 03/30 11:05 AM
Notified IT Department to electronically transfer case to the Northern District of Ohio. (wld)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order Mon 03/30 10:56 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio, assigned to Honorable Dan A. Polster. (wld)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William P Symmes on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Symmes, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Meyer on behalf of Jaclyn P. Gatling, Nathan C. Grace, Leslie Roberson (Meyer, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
33 33 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/06 12:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anda, Inc. (Thomas, Stephen)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Anda, Inc. (Thomas, Stephen)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Simon T. Bailey on behalf of Anda, Inc. (Bailey, Simon)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 01/06 11:22 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #28, #29, and #30: Advising attorney that in the future, the complete case number of 1:19cv937 LG-RHW should be included on all pleadings. (RLW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
30 30 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/03 10:41 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Thomas, Stephen)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Thomas, Stephen)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Simon T. Bailey on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Bailey, Simon)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2019
order Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings Mon 12/30 11:19 AM
TEXT ORDER granting24 Motion to Stay Proceedings. The Court has received notification that a Conditional Transfer Order has been filed by the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. See MDL No. 2804, Docket No. 6566. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL FOLLOW. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/30/2019 (Guirola, Louis)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
27 27 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/27 1:20 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re9 Emergency MOTION to Remand and For Expedited Briefing Schedule MOTION to Expedite filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/27 1:17 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 Emergency MOTION to Remand and For Expedited Briefing Schedule MOTION to Expedite filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 12/27 8:39 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 25. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (JCH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2019
25 25 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 12/26 12:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc.(Louis, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Granting Temporary Stay
24 24 motion Stay Proceedings Thu 12/26 11:57 AM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc.(Louis, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Order, Wells v. Purdue filed Oct. 4, 2019,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Order, Hogg v. Purdue filed Sept. 4, 2019,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Order, Angelina v. Allergan filed Dec. 4, 2019,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Order, Williamson v. Purdue filed Oct. 29, 2019,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Order, Duval v. Purdue filed July 26, 2019,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Order, Ellis v. Walgreens filed July 24, 2019,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Order, Walker v. OptumRx filed July 16, 2019,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Order, Rockwall v. Purdue filed July 5, 2019,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - List of Pending Motions to Remand,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Transfer Order No. 127, MDL 2804,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Orders, Noble County filed Dec. 14, 2018 & Jan. 24, 2019,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Order - Seminole v. Purdue filed Apr. 3, 2019,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Order, Takoma v. Purdue filed Oct. 4, 2019
Monday, December 23, 2019
23 23 notice Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY Mon 12/23 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF FOURTH AMENDED BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION AGAINST CONTINUATION OF THESE PROCEEDINGS AS TO RELATED PARTIES TO DEBTOR PURDUE PHARMA L.P. AND AFFILIATED DEBTORS by Jaclyn P. Gatling, Nathan C. Grace, Leslie Roberson(Woods, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Fourth Amended Preliminary Injunction Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/18 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Patrick Strubel on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Strubel, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/17 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dorissa S. Smith on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/17 12:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health, Inc. (McCraney, W.)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/17 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by W. Thomas McCraney, III on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (McCraney, W.)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/17 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leo J. Carmody, Jr on behalf of Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. (Carmody, Leo)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/17 11:25 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Mayo, J.)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/17 10:46 AM
ORDER granting15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, granting4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Certain Defendants , granting11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint . Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 17, 2019 (King, Steve)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/17 8:25 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Certain Defendants to respond to the Complaint by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Mayo, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/16 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Cal Mayo, Jr on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Mayo, J.)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/16 11:52 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC. (Strubel, J.)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Staying Discovery Mon 12/16 9:53 AM
ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 12/16/2019. (SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/13 3:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Hunt, Courtney)
Related: [-]
10 10 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 12/13 3:35 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re9 Emergency MOTION to Remand and For Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Alliance Healthcare System, Anderson Regional Health System, Biloxi HMA, LLC, Boa Vida Hospital of Aberdeen, MS, LLC, Brandon HMA, LLC, Clarksdale HMA, LLC, Delta Regional Medical Center, Field Memorial Community Hospital, Jackson HMA, LLC, Madison HMA, LLC, Magnolia Regional Health Center, Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Natchez Hospital Company, LLC, North Sunflower Medical Center, Progressive Medical Management of Bates Ville, ROH, LLC, River Oaks Hospital, LLC, Singing River Health System, Tippah County Hospital, Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC, Wesley Health System, LLC (Barrett, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Remand Expedite Fri 12/13 3:33 PM
Emergency MOTION to Remand and For Expedited Briefing Schedule by Alliance Healthcare System, Anderson Regional Health System, Biloxi HMA, LLC, Boa Vida Hospital of Aberdeen, MS, LLC, Brandon HMA, LLC, Clarksdale HMA, LLC, Delta Regional Medical Center, Field Memorial Community Hospital, Jackson HMA, LLC, Madison HMA, LLC, Magnolia Regional Health Center, Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Natchez Hospital Company, LLC, North Sunflower Medical Center, Progressive Medical Management of Bates Ville, ROH, LLC, River Oaks Hospital, LLC, Singing River Health System, Tippah County Hospital, Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC, Wesley Health System, LLC (Barrett, John). Added MOTION to Expedite on 12/13/2019 (wld)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/13 3:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Cole, Edderek)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/13 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Cole, Edderek)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/13 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Tardy, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/13 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Mansfield, Kenna)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/13 11:31 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Certain Defendants by H.D. Smith, LLC (Hinshaw, Corey)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 12/13 3:47 PM
Docket Annotation as to Doc. #9. This document requests two motion reliefs. Each motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction by adding the relief to "expedite" Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (wld)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/09 3:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc MDL Letter Mon 12/09 10:04 AM
Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint/notice of removal. (wld)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2019
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 12/09 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. from Chancery Court of Jackson County, Mississippi, case number 30CH1 19cv01879 TLH. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4156844) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (wld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Part 1-Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Part 2-Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-Part 1-State Court Record,
Att: 4 Exhibit B-Part 2-State Court Record,
Att: 5 Exhibit B-Part 3-State Court Record,
Att: 6 Exhibit C-Part 1-Service on Walmart, Inc.,
Att: 7 Exhibit C-Part 2-Service on Walmart, Inc.,
Att: 8 Exhibit D-Part 1-Service on Walmart Stores East, LP,
Att: 9 Exhibit D-Part 2-Service on Walmart Stores East, LP,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet