Apache Tribe of Oklahoma v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46119 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Western, 5:19-cv-01026 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 16, 2019 2:27 PM EST |
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SAJ Distributors
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Apache Tribe of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/16/2019 2:28 PM EST |
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Caddo County, case number CJ-2019-00069 filed by McKesson Corp.(em) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Opinion Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Caddo County Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 85 pgs Exhibit 3 - Petition, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance (McBride for Amerisource)ntry of Appearance (McBride for Amerisource), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Entry of Appearance (Campbell Maddy for McKesson), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Motion Special Appearance Extension of Time to Answer (McKesson), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Entry of Appearance (Ray for Cardinal), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Entry of Appearance (Ridgeway for Johnson), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Entry of Appearance (Sparks for Johnson), | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer (Janssen), | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Order Granting Extension to Answer (Janssen), | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Order Granting Extension to Answer (McKesson), | ||
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3032531. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | ||
2 | 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
3 | 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Monday, November 11, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
5 | 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
6 | 6 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
8 | 8 RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 11/12/19. (wh) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
9 | 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Patrick R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Honorable Robin J. Cauthron no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 11/12/19. (wh) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER granting7 the Distributor Defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 11/13/2019. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
12 | 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 12/9/2019.] | |
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-01026. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |