California Central District Court
Judge:Virginia A Phillips
Referred: Suzanne H Segal
Case #: 2:19-cv-10419
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2019
Terminated:Feb 13, 2020
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 19STCV37217
Last checked: Saturday Jun 06, 2020 4:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Marylu Ramos Gonzalez
Represented By
Thomas K Richards
Singh Singh And Trauben LLP
contact info
Michael A Trauben
Singh Singh And Trauben LLP
contact info
Defendant
Oplaai, LLC
Represented By
Thomas K Richards
Singh Singh And Trauben LLP
contact info
Michael A Trauben
Singh Singh And Trauben LLP
contact info
Defendant
Victor Zambrano Raygoza
Represented By
Thomas K Richards
Singh Singh And Trauben LLP
contact info
Michael A Trauben
Singh Singh And Trauben LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Zambrano
Represented By
Thomas K Richards
Singh Singh And Trauben LLP
contact info
Michael A Trauben
Singh Singh And Trauben LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Del Records, Inc.
Represented By
Paul A Aguilar
Olivarez Madruga Lemieux O'Neill LLP
contact info
Michael Daly Campion
Olivarez Madruga Lemieux O'Neill LLP
contact info
Thomas M Madruga
Olivarez Madruga Lemieux O'Neill, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 14, 2020
14 14 3 pgs misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Fri 02/14 9:49 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
13 13 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 02/13 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Del Records, Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Campion, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
12 12 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/23 12:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF DEL RECORDS, INC. TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to Amend11 : The Court, having read and considered the parties' Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff Del Records, Inc. to File a First Amended Complaint, and good cause appearing, HEREBY ORDERS as follows: 1. The Court GRANTS the Joint Stipulation; and 2. The deadline for Plaintiff Del Records, Inc. to File a First Amended Complaint is extended to up through and including February 14, 2020. (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
11 11 5 pgs stip Extension of Time to Amend Tue 01/14 6:22 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Marylu Ramos Gonzalez, Oplaai, LLC, Victor Zambrano Raygoza, Jennifer Zambrano.(Trauben, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 13, 2019
10 10 5 pgs stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 12/13 8:57 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jennifer Zambrano answer now due 1/15/2020; Marylu Ramos Gonzalez answer now due 1/15/2020; Oplaai, LLC answer now due 1/15/2020; Victor Zambrano Raygoza answer now due 1/15/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Jennifer Zambrano; Marylu Ramos Gonzalez; Oplaai, LLC; Victor Zambrano Raygoza.(Trauben, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 12/12 1:04 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 12/11 12:03 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 12/11 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
6 6 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 12/09 9:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants MARYLU RAMOS GONZALEZ, OPLAAI, LLC, VICTOR ZAMBRANO RAYGOZA, JENNIFER ZAMBRANO, re Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 , Jury Demand5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 served on 12/09/2019. (Trauben, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 trial Jury Demand Mon 12/09 9:03 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants MARYLU RAMOS GONZALEZ, OPLAAI, LLC, VICTOR ZAMBRANO RAYGOZA, JENNIFER ZAMBRANO.. (Trauben, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 12/09 8:57 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by MARYLU RAMOS GONZALEZ, OPLAAI, LLC, VICTOR ZAMBRANO RAYGOZA, JENNIFER ZAMBRANO. (Trauben, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 12/09 8:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Trauben, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 12/09 8:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants MARYLU RAMOS GONZALEZ, OPLAAI, LLC, VICTOR ZAMBRANO RAYGOZA, JENNIFER ZAMBRANO. (Trauben, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/09 8:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV37217 Receipt No: 0973-24920780 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants JENNIFER ZAMBRANO, MARYLU RAMOS GONZALEZ, OPLAAI, LLC, VICTOR ZAMBRANO RAYGOZA. (Attorney Michael A Trauben added to party MARYLU RAMOS GONZALEZ(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Trauben added to party OPLAAI, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Trauben added to party VICTOR ZAMBRANO RAYGOZA(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Trauben added to party JENNIFER ZAMBRANO(pty:dft))(Trauben, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A",
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit "B",
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit "C",
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit "D",
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit "E",
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit "F"
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 12/11 12:10 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, Marylu Ramos Gonzalez, Oplaai, LLC, Victor Zambrano Raygoza, Jennifer Zambrano, Filed by Plaintiff Del Records, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/16/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 12/11 12:13 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Del Records, Inc., upon Defendant Oplaai, LLC served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Stephanie Campbell, Client Service Representative in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/05/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 12/11 12:15 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Del Records, Inc., upon Defendant Victor Zambrano Raygoza served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/05/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 12/11 12:23 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Marylu Ramos Gonzalez, upon Defendant Marylu Ramos Gonzalez served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. In compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/05/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]