Town of Maysville v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-03434 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 3:53 PM EDT |
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma US, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dynax Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation f/k/a United Technologies Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Ansul Company
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC, Inc. f/k/a Asahi Glass Co.
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Town of Maysville
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
115 | 115
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
114 | 114
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BASF Corp.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |