Putnam County, Florida v. Endo Health Solutions Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46122 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 3:19-cv-01301 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 17, 2019 4:10 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Putnam County, Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/17/2019 4:09 PM EST |
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 287 pgs COMPLAINT Putnam County, Florida against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16121613) filed by Putnam County, Florida.(Romano, Eric) [Transferred from flmd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-1301-J-20MCR. (LRB) [Transferred from flmd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-01301. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |