City of Headland, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46131 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Middle, 1:19-cv-00886 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2019 3:30 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Headland, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/18/2019 3:30 PM EST |
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Headland, Alabama. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc1 for PDF) (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 154 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055706.), filed by City of Headland, Alabama.(wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt | ||
2 | 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Headland, Alabama. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of1 Complaint and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement. (bes, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, &2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, signed by Julie Buckner for Actavis Pharma, Inc., served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (amf, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
5 | 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, &2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, signed by Julie Buckner for TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (amf, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by illegible for Johnson & Johnson served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
7 | 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Marilyn P. for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
8 | 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Kelly Webster for: McKesson Corporation served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
9 | 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Noramco, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by A. Verna for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
18 | 18 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 12/5/2019 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC, Northern District of Ohio. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by CT Corporation for: Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Sammy Azer for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
14 | 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by C. S. for Cephalon, Inc. served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
15 | 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by CT Corporation for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
16 | 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons,1 Complaint, and2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by C. S. for Actavis, LLC served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No PDF attached to this entry) (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | ||
17 | 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Unclaimed, Unable To Forward." Counsel is notified via this notice of unperfected service. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/11/2019.] | |
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
19 | 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Middle. Case number 1:19-cv-00886. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |