New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Rachel P Kovner
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:19-cv-06951
Nature of Suit310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2019
Terminated:Dec 10, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 08, 2020 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd.
28 LIBERTY ST.
NEW YORK, NY 10005
Represented By
Andrew John Harakas
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Derrick Jen
Represented By
Sang Joon Sim
Sim & Depaola, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Saturday, December 10, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Sat 12/10 10:17 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The stipulation of dismissal with prejudice at33 is so-ordered. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 12/10/2022. (SDC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/09 2:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. (Weissman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 11/29 10:04 AM
ORDER: The parties request that the Court adjourn the conference scheduled for December 1, 2022. ECF No. 32. Although the parties have not filed the stipulation of discontinuance, the request is granted. The conference is cancelled. The parties shall file the stipulation of discontinuance by December 9, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/29/2022. (HY)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
32 32 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 11/28 1:20 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for December 1, 2022 by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Weissman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
order Scheduling Order Thu 11/03 3:02 PM
ORDER: The parties notified the Court that they had reached a settlement and the Court directed the parties to file a stipulation and order of dismissal by October 31, 2022. No stipulation has been filed. The Court shall hold an in-person conference on December 1, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York unless the stipulation of discontinuance is filed by November 28, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/3/2022. (HY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
order Scheduling Order Thu 09/15 10:17 AM
ORDER: The parties report that they have reached an agreement to settle this action. ECF No. 31. The parties shall file a stipulation and order of dismissal by October 31, 2022. All other deadlines are adjourned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/15/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
31 31 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 09/13 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. (Weissman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
order Scheduling Order Thu 07/14 3:14 PM
ORDER: The Court held a telephone status conference in plaintiff's personal injury case on July 14, 2022. Fact discovery is closed. The parties shall complete all expert discovery, including depositions, by October 14, 2022. The parties shall make any premotion conference request or request approval of a schedule to prepare the joint pretrial order in accordance with Judge Kovner's Individual Rules by October 28, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/14/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 07/14 3:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Status Conference held on 7/14/2022 (AT&T Log #10:41-11:04.) (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 07/14 3:17 PM
ORDER denying27 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. See Order dated July 14, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/14/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
order Scheduling Order Fri 07/08 12:06 PM
ORDER: The parties report that the mediation was unsuccessful. ECF No. 30. The Court shall hold a status conference by telephone on July 14, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 10:30 a.m. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/8/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
30 30 misc Status Report Thu 07/07 10:23 PM
STATUS REPORT by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. (Weissman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Wed 06/22 1:05 PM
REPORT of Mediation unsettled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 7/6/2022. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
adr Selection of Mediator Tue 05/31 4:27 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Joseph Kevin McKay selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place remotely on June 22, 2022. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms.The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
adr Mediation Instructions Thu 05/12 10:58 AM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
order Scheduling Order Fri 04/29 10:00 AM
ORDER: The parties report that they are no closer to completing discovery or settling this matter. The Court hereby refers the instant action to Court annexed mediation. The parties are directed to contact the Court's ADR Department at (718) 613-2577. The parties shall conduct the mediation by June 29, 2022 and file a status letter by July 7, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/29/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
29 29 misc Status Report Thu 04/28 4:17 PM
STATUS REPORT by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. (Weissman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
minutes Status Conference Fri 04/15 3:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Status Conference held on 4/15/2022 (AT&T Log #11:02-11:33.) (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
order Scheduling Order Thu 04/14 1:33 PM
ORDER: The Court held a status conference in plaintiff's personal injury case on April 14, 2022 and declined to rule on defendant's request for extension for the reasons stated on the record. The parties shall file a status letter by April 28, 2022. The Court strongly encourages the parties to discuss resolution of this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/14/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
28 28 respoth Reply in Opposition Fri 04/08 5:19 PM
REPLY in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Extension of time to Complete Discovery (6th) filed by Derrick Jen. (Nath, Sameer)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Fri 04/08 11:08 AM
ORDER: Defendant requests an extension of time to produce the crew member witnesses Liu Ying and Wei Rong for depositions. There have been five letter requests for extension of the discovery deadline in this action; all of which have been granted. Plaintiff shall file its response to defendant's request by April 11, 2022. The Court shall address this matter at the telephone conference scheduled on April 14, 2022 at 11:00. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/8/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
27 27 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 04/07 7:14 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Weissman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Thursday, March 03, 2022
26 26 misc Transcript Thu 03/03 12:47 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 17, 2022, before Judge Bloom. Court Transcriber: Transcriptions Plus II, Inc.. Email address: RL.Transcriptions2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 3/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2022. (Rocco, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
order Scheduling Order Fri 02/18 12:55 PM
ORDER: The Court held a telephone status conference in plaintiff's personal injury case on February 17, 2022. The parties discussed the difficulties in producing the Hainan airlines flight attendants for deposition, including the pandemic and other restrictions. However, defendants shall produce Mrs. Liu and Ms. Wei so plaintiff can complete their depositions by April 11, 2022. The Court shall hold another telephone status conference on April 11, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 11:00 a.m. Parties shall be prepared to discuss their expert discovery requirements by the conference on April 11, 2022. The Court strongly encourages the parties to discuss settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/18/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 02/18 12:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Telephone Conference held on 2/17/2022 (AT&T Log #1:59-2:21.) (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
order Scheduling Order Tue 01/25 12:26 PM
ORDER: The parties request a status conference to discuss the discovery issues identified in the parties' joint status letter. ECF No.25 . The Court shall hold a status conference on February 17, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 2:00 p.m. The parties are reminded that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. In light of the status conference, the current deadline to complete all discovery by February 15, 2022 is stayed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/25/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
25 25 misc Letter Fri 01/21 2:31 PM
Letter Joint Status Letter by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. (Weissman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
minutes Status Conference Tue 11/16 12:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Status Conference held on 11/16/2021. (AT&T Log# 11:35-11:57). (Wilhelm, Samantha)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Tue 11/16 1:03 PM
ORDER: The Court held a status conference in plaintiff's personal injury case on November 16, 2021. The parties shall complete all discovery by February 15, 2022, including the depositions of the two Hainan Airlines crew members, any re-deposition of plaintiff as well as expert discovery. The parties shall file a joint status letter by January 21, 2022. The parties are strongly encouraged to discuss resolution of this matter. As plaintiff relayed that he had made a demand, defendant is strongly encouraged to respond with an offer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/16/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 10/21 11:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Telephone Conference held on 10/21/2021 (AT&T Log#: 10:35-11:07). (Wilhelm, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/20 6:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sameer Nath on behalf of Derrick Jen (aty to be noticed) (Nath, Sameer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
order Scheduling Order Thu 10/07 4:57 PM
ORDER: The parties jointly request an extension of the discovery and dispositive motion deadlines. ECF No 23. The parties also raise an issue regarding the deposition of Hainan Airline's employee Cabin Manager Ying Liu. Id. The request is granted. The new deadlines shall be set at a court conference on October 21, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 10:30 a.m. The parties are reminded that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 10/7/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
23 23 notice Notice(Other) Tue 10/05 1:52 PM
NOTICE by Derrick Jen Joint Status Letter- Extension of Discovery Time & Rule Deposition Time (Sim, Sang)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 09/02 3:25 PM
ORDER: The parties jointly request an extension of the discovery deadlines. ECF No. 22. The request is granted. The parties shall complete fact discovery by October 6, 2021 and all expert discovery by January 5, 2021. Any party seeking to file a dispositive motion shall do so by January 19, 2021 in accordance with Judge Kovner's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/2/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 09/01 5:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Weissman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
order Scheduling Order Mon 06/28 1:42 PM
ORDER: The parties jointly request an extension of the discovery deadlines. ECF No. 21. The request is granted in part and denied in part. The parties shall complete fact discovery by September 6, 2021 and all expert discovery by December 6, 2021. Any party seeking to file a dispositive motion shall do so by December 20, 2021 in accordance with Judge Kovner's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/28/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
21 21 misc Status Report Fri 06/25 3:36 PM
STATUS REPORT and Discovery Extension Request by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. (Weissman, Philip)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/25 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Richard Weissman on behalf of Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Weissman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
order Status Report Order Mon 05/24 5:17 PM
ORDER: The parties report that plaintiff was hospitalized for COVID-19 and is unable to appear for an independent medical examination and deposition at this time. ECF No. 19. The parties shall file a joint letter by June 28, 2021, setting forth the status of discovery and whether the parties request an extension of the discovery deadline. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/24/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
19 19 misc Status Report Fri 05/21 11:33 AM
STATUS REPORT by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. (Harakas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 03/22 1:29 PM
ORDER: The parties jointly request an extension of the discovery deadlines in light of a recent bankruptcy proceeding pending in China involving defendant Hainan Airlines. ECF No. 18. The request is granted in part and denied in part. The parties shall complete all fact discovery by July 7, 2021. The parties shall file a joint status letter by May 21, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/22/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 03/19 2:07 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Harakas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Decision
Thursday, December 10, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 12/10 6:01 PM
ORDER: The parties request a first extension of the discovery deadlines. ECF No. 17. The request is granted in part and denied in part. The parties shall complete all fact discovery in this case by April 8, 2021. The parties shall file a joint status letter, by March 22, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/10/2020. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
17 17 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 12/07 12:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Status Letter and Joint Request for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Harakas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
order Scheduling Order Tue 11/24 3:00 PM
ORDER: This case was reassigned to me on November 16, 2020. The parties shall file a joint status letter with the Court by December 7, 2020. The pretrial conference scheduled for February 22, 2021, ECF No. 13, is cancelled.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/24/2020. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/16 2:06 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
order Order(Other) 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 10/20 11:55 AM
ORDER -- Due to a change in the court's calendar, the telephone status conference previously scheduled for October 26, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. is adjourned, sine die . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/20/2020. (Almonte, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
16 16 misc Letter Wed 05/06 9:36 AM
Letter to Court advising of Compliance with Court April 6, 2020 Minute Order by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. (Harakas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
15 15 misc Transcript Wed 04/08 3:31 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 6, 2020, before Judge Orenstein. Court Transcriber: Aria Services, Inc., Telephone number 845-260-1377. Email address: aria@leinen.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/29/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2020. (Rocco, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
14 14 motion Reconsideration Tue 04/07 1:59 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration of requirement of Minute Order by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Harakas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 04/07 2:37 PM
ORDER terminating as moot14 Motion for Reconsideration -- The motion to reconsider appears to be moot, in that the defendant's counsel has secured the minutes of the initial conference and will presumably provide the transcript and my order to the defendant. In any event, the movant appears to assume, incorrectly, that the order at issue represents a sanction for allowing an associate (who, the movant neglects to mention, is neither counsel of record nor admitted to practice before this court) to appear in place of the defendant's lead counsel. The order is not a sanction for misconduct, but rather a curative measure to minimize the potential prejudice to a defendant who was for all effective purposes unrepresented at the initial conference for reasons its counsel of record deemed sufficient. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/7/2020. (Walker, Anna) Modified on 4/7/2020 (Almonte, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2020
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/06 10:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures:April 6, 2020. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: May 6, 2020. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: June 5, 2020. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): October 26, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by: December 7, 2020. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by: January 6, 2021. Defendant's expert disclosures due by: February 8, 2021. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: February 8, 2021. Pretrial Conference ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): February 22, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: March 8, 2021. Joint pretrial order due by: April 5, 2021. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/6/2020. (Orenstein, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/06 10:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held by telephone on 4/6/2020. Scheduling: (1) The next status conference will be held on October 26, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on February 22, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Summary: (1) The defendant's counsel of record, Andrew J. Harakas, did not appear as required and did not seek leave to be excused, but instead had an attorney who is not admitted to practice in this court join the call. To minimize the potential prejudice to the defendant arising from its lack of representation, I respectfully direct Mr. Harakas to secure the minutes of today's conference (at his own expense and not the client's), to provide the client with copies of that transcript and of this minute order, and to certify compliance with the foregoing directives by May 6, 2020. (2) I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. (Orenstein, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
11 11 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 04/02 2:27 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Initial Conference Questionnaire by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. (Harakas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/17 10:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to attend an initial discovery planning conference on April 6, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. that will take place telephonically. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 391-4302. I respectfully direct all counsel to call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. No later than April 2, 2020, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/17/2020. (Almonte, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/13 5:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Harakas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/13 5:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. for Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Harakas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/04 11:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derrick Jen. Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd. served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (DePaola, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/07 11:59 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Judge Carol Bagley Amon no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 12/12 2:10 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 12/12 2:09 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 12/12 2:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Hainan Airlines Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/11 6:34 PM
Proposed Summons. by Derrick Jen (Sim, Sang)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/11 6:28 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Derrick Jen (Sim, Sang)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/11 6:16 PM
COMPLAINT against HAINAN AIRLINES HOLDING CO., LTD. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12147521 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Derrick Jen. (Sim, Sang)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/12 2:07 PM
Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]