Nevada District Court
Case #: 2:19-mj-00934
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2019 11:29 PM PST
Defendant
Marlowe Singleton (1)
Represented By
Robert E. O'Brien, III
Federal Public Defender, District Of Nevada
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert Knief
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jessica Oliva
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/12/2019 12:18 AM PST
Monday, December 09, 2019
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (LAA)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Marlowe Singleton. Documents received from the Southern District of California include: Order on Petition for Violation and Warrant. (SLD)
Related: [-]
2 2 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceeding as to Marlowe Singleton held on 12/9/2019 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller ; AUSA: Jessica Oliva, Robert Knief ; Def Counsel: Robert O'Brien, FPD ; PTS: Emily McKillip, Alicia Coughlin ; Court Reporter/Recorder: Liberty/CRD ; Recording start and end times: 3:54:04 - 4:05:07 ; Courtroom: 3B ; Defendant is present in US Marshals custody and in no restraints during court proceeding. Defendant did not give the Federal Public Defender permission to represent her and she did not complete any pre-hearing paperwork. The Court attempted to the canvass the Defendant, but the Defendant made statements and responses that were neither responsive or related to the Court's questions. On it's own motion, the Court makes a record finding that there may be a competency issue and orders the Defendant to have a psychiatric evaluation. The Court will issue a separate written Order and the Government will provide additional documentation. Status Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler in a courtroom to be determined. Defendant is remanded to custody pending evaluation and further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
Related: [-]