Moe v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46138 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Eastern, 1:19-cv-01469 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2019 10:55 AM EST |
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Moe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/30/2019 10:55 AM EST |
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 97 pgs Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6946971.), filed by Alexander Moe.(Connolly, John) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2019.] | ||
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
Case Electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (aott) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2019.] | ||
2 | 2 Certified Transfer Order (CTO-124) from the MDL. MDL No 2804. (aott) [Transferred from vaed on 12/16/2019.] | |
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 1:19-cv-01469. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |