Parsa et al v. Google L.L.C. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Ann Bencivengo |
Referred: | Allison H Goddard |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-02407 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331cv Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 13, 2020 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hanson Robotics
|
|
Defendant
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
|
|
Defendant
Rachel Maddow
|
|
Defendant
MSNBC
|
|
Defendant
Don Lemon
|
|
Defendant
Sam Kriegman
|
|
Defendant
John Doe's 1-Unlimited
|
|
Defendant
ICarbon X
|
|
Defendant
Harvard
|
|
Defendant
James McCabe
|
|
Defendant
Bill Gates
|
|
Defendant
Festo
|
|
Defendant
Darper
|
|
Defendant
Anderson Cooper
|
|
Defendant
James Comey
|
|
Defendant
Hillary Clinton
|
|
Defendant
James Clapper
|
|
Defendant
Didi Chuxing
|
|
Defendant
Eric Schmidt
|
|
Defendant
Wyss Institute
|
|
Defendant
Washington Post
|
|
Defendant
University of Vermont
|
|
Defendant
Time Magazine
|
|
Defendant
The World Bank
|
|
Defendant
Soros Fund Management
|
|
Defendant
George Soros
|
|
Defendant
Sensetime
|
|
Defendant
Chinese Communist Party
|
|
Defendant
Adam Schiff
|
|
Defendant
Qualcomm
|
|
Defendant
Nancy Pelosi
|
|
Defendant
Open Society Foundations
|
|
Defendant
Barack Hussein Obama
|
|
Defendant
New York Times
|
|
Defendant
Microsoft
|
|
Defendant
Megvii Face
|
|
Defendant
CISON PR NewsWire
|
|
Defendant
Google L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-29
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Inc
|
|
Defendant
DeepMind Inc
|
|
Defendant
Larry Page
|
|
Defendant
Elon Musk
|
|
Defendant
Neuralink Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sundar Pichai
|
|
Defendant
Tesla Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sergey Brin
|
|
Defendant
Alphabet Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mark Zuckerberg
|
|
Defendant
Huawei
|
|
Defendant
Alibaba
|
|
Defendant
Amazon
|
|
Defendant
Jeff Bezos
|
|
Defendant
Hunter Biden
|
|
Defendant
Joe Biden
|
|
Defendant
Joshua Bongard
|
|
Defendant
Boston Dynamics
|
|
Defendant
John O. Brennon
|
|
Defendant
CNN
|
|
Plaintiff
Cyrus A. Parsa
4275 Executive Square Suite 200
La Jolla, CA 92037 |
|
Plaintiff
The Worlds People
|
|
Plaintiff
Christians
|
|
Plaintiff
Falun Dafa Practitioners
|
|
Plaintiff
John Does 1-Unlimited
|
|
Plaintiff
Journalists
|
|
Plaintiff
Judges
|
|
Plaintiff
Lawyers
|
|
Plaintiff
The AI Organization, Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Tibetans
|
|
Plaintiff
Uyghurs
|
|
Plaintiff
Victims of Persecution, Rape, Torture, Concentration Camps, Sex, Human, and Organ Trafficking and Organ Harvesting in China, Hong Kong, America and Around the World
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/1/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (dsn) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/5/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (anh) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Uyghurs, Huawei, Alibaba, Alphabet Inc, Amazon, Jeff Bezos, Hunter Biden, Joe Biden, Joshua Bongard, Boston Dynamics, John O. Brennon, Sergey Brin, CISON PR NewsWire, CNN, Chinese Communist Party, Didi Chuxing, James Clapper, Hillary Clinton, James Comey, Anderson Cooper, Darper, DeepMind Inc, Facebook Inc, Festo, Bill Gates, Google L.L.C., Hanson Robotics, Harvard, ICarbon X, John Doe's 1-Unlimited, John Does 1-29, Sam Kriegman, Larry Page, Don Lemon, MSNBC, Rachel Maddow, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, James McCabe, Megvii Face, Microsoft, Elon Musk, Neuralink Inc, New York Times, Barack Hussein Obama, Open Society Foundations, Nancy Pelosi, Sundar Pichai, Qualcomm, Adam Schiff, Eric Schmidt, Sensetime, George Soros, Soros Fund Management, Tesla Inc, The World Bank, Time Magazine, University of Vermont, Washington Post, Wyss Institute, Mark Zuckerberg, filed by Tibetans, Journalists, The Worlds People, John Does 1-Unlimited, The AI Organization, Inc, Cyrus A. Parsa, Christians, Victims of Persecution, Rape, Torture, Concentration Camps, Sex, Human, and Organ Trafficking and Organ Harvesting in China, Hong Kong, America and Around the World, Lawyers, Judges, Falun Dafa Practitioners, Uyghurs.New Summons Requested. (anh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jmr) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc, Sergey Brin, CISON PR NewsWire, DeepMind Inc, Facebook Inc, Google L.L.C., John Does 1-29, Larry Page, Elon Musk, Neuralink Inc, Sundar Pichai, Tesla Inc, Mark Zuckerberg ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS117684.), filed by John Does 1-Unlimited, Tibetans, The AI Organization, Inc, Cyrus A. Parsa, Christians, Victims of Persecution, Rape, Torture, Concentration Camps, Sex, Human, and Organ Trafficking and Organ Harvesting in China, Hong Kong, America and Around the World, Lawyers, Judges, Falun Dafa Practitioners, Journalists, Uyghurs. The new case number is 3:19-cv-02407-CAB-AHG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Parsa, Cyrus A.)(jmr) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |