Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-04947
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2019
Terminated:Mar 09, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jun 14, 2020 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
JOY BABCOCK
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 09, 2020
7 7 6 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/09 2:00 PM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiff's failure to comply with court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the current individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/9/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 10:43 AM
Summons Issued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 02/19 10:53 PM
NOTICE of filing Summons to Issue (OPC) by JOY BABCOCK (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 1:00 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 02/10 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Filing Summons to Issue by JOY BABCOCK (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, December 31, 2019
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 12/31 8:09 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, filed by JOY BABCOCK. (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
1 1 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 12/17 3:03 PM
ORDER - Short Form Complaint must be filed on or before 12/31/2019 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/17 2:48 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. (djb)
Related: [-]