Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-04948
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2019
Terminated:Aug 03, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jun 14, 2020 6:40 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
BEVERLY BAILEY
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 03, 2020
12 12 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/04 10:22 AM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A only, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
11 11 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 07/31 4:18 PM
ORDER - The motions to withdraw as counsel of record without substitution in the cases identified on Exhibit A are GRANTED. Attorney Louise R. Caro and the law firm of Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC are relieved of any further obligation for representation of those plaintiffs. The Clerk is directed to update the individual dockets to reflect the last known address of the respective plaintiffs, as indicated on Exhibit A. The Clerk is further directed to mail a copy of this Order to the respective plaintiffs at the address provided. Unless and until substitute counsel appears on a plaintiffs behalf,the Court will assume the plaintiff has elected to proceed pro se. Attorney LOUISE R CARO and JENNIFER R LIAKOS terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/31/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 07/01 8:47 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:9 Order, re:8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney,10 Notice of Further Declaration to be Relieved as Counsel Filer Under Sealed. (no response filed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
10 10 misc Sealed Document - Sealed PDF Mon 06/15 4:20 PM
Notice of Further Declaration to be Relieved as Counsel Filer Under Sealed. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion to Withdraw
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/08 9:15 AM
ORDER - The Court needs additional information from Ms. Caro. Accordingly, Ms. Caro is directed to submit under seal in each case, for the Courts in camera review, a detailed description of the "circumstances [that] have arisen that, under the rules, require Napoli Shkolnik to seek withdrawal as counsel." This submission is due by June 15, 2020 . By that same date, a copy of both this Order and Ms. Caro's submission must be sent to the respective plaintiff to whom it applies. If the plaintiffs wish to file a response, they must do so by June 29, 2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/8/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 06/05 7:50 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
8 8 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 06/04 8:55 AM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BEVERLY BAILEY. (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/08 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LOUISE R CARO on behalf of BEVERLY BAILEY (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 10:43 AM
Summons Issued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 02/19 7:19 PM
NOTICE of filing Summons to Issue (OPC) by BEVERLY BAILEY (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 1:01 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 02/10 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Filing Summons to Issue by BEVERLY BAILEY (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, December 31, 2019
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 12/31 8:12 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, filed by BEVERLY BAILEY. (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
1 1 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 12/17 3:12 PM
ORDER - Short Form Complaint must be filed on or before 12/31/2019 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/17 3:10 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. (djb)
Related: [-]