City of Brookhaven, Mississippi v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46143 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 17, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Southern, 5:19-cv-00127 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 02, 2020 10:20 AM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Brookhaven, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/02/2020 10:20 AM EST |
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 119 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4145602), filed by City of Brookhaven, Mississippi.(VM) [Transferred from mssd on 12/17/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint/notice of removal. (VM) [Transferred from mssd on 12/17/2019.] | |
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER staying telephonic case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 27, 2019 (KPM) [Transferred from mssd on 12/17/2019.] | |
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
District Transfer Out to the Northern District of Ohio. (VM) [Transferred from mssd on 12/17/2019.] | ||
Remark: Order Transferring Case4 emailed to IT Department to electronically transfer case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Clerk will docket confirmation email when received from the Northern District of Ohio. (VM) [Transferred from mssd on 12/17/2019.] | ||
4 | 4 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio. (VM) [Transferred from mssd on 12/17/2019.] | |
5 | 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER.(VM) [Transferred from mssd on 12/17/2019.] | |
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Southern. Case number 5:19-cv-00127. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |