District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Tanya S Chutkan
Case #: 1:19-cv-03774
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2019
Terminated:Feb 19, 2020
Last checked: Monday Jun 15, 2020 6:41 AM EDT
Defendant
TED CRUZ
Represented By
Patricia M. Bryan
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Thomas Edward Caballero
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Grant Raymond Vinik
U.S. Senate
contact info
Morgan John Frankel
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Defendant
LINDSEY GRAHAM
Represented By
Patricia M. Bryan
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Thomas Edward Caballero
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Grant Raymond Vinik
U.S. Senate
contact info
Morgan John Frankel
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Defendant
MITCH MCCONNELL
Represented By
Patricia M. Bryan
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Thomas Edward Caballero
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Grant Raymond Vinik
U.S. Senate
contact info
Morgan John Frankel
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Defendant
RAND PAUL
Represented By
Patricia M. Bryan
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Thomas Edward Caballero
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Grant Raymond Vinik
U.S. Senate
contact info
Morgan John Frankel
Office Of Senate Legal Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
MARTIN MCMAHON
Represented By
Martin F. McMahon
Mcmahon & Associates
contact info

GPO Feb 19 2020
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/19/2020. (lcsd)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 02/19 9:24 AM
ORDER granting18 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, denying5 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction as moot, and denying7 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/19/2020. (lcsd)
Related: [-]
21 21 7 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 02/19 9:18 AM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re5 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/19/2020. (lcsd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
20 20 respm Response to Order of the Court Tue 02/11 9:36 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,, Defendants' reply in support of dismissal filed by TED CRUZ, LINDSEY GRAHAM, MITCH MCCONNELL, RAND PAUL. (Bryan, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
19 19 respm Reply to opposition to motion Mon 02/03 5:16 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MARTIN MCMAHON. (McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/31 2:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 2/6/2020. Reply due by 2/11/2020. (tb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
order .Order Thu 01/30 2:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER: On January 24, 2020, Defendants filed an opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, in which they state this court should dismiss the action for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The court construes this as a motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). On January 28, 2020, the deadline passed for Plaintiff to file a reply to Defendants' opposition without a reply from Plaintiff. Accordingly, the court hereby orders Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss by February 6, 2020. Plaintiff's brief shall be no longer than 10 pages. Defendants may reply by February 11, 2020. Defendants' reply shall be no longer than 5 pages. If Plaintiff fails to respond, the court shall treat the motion as conceded. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/30/2020. (lcsd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
18 18 23 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 01/24 3:03 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TED CRUZ, LINDSEY GRAHAM, MITCH MCCONNELL, RAND PAUL. (Bryan, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
order .Order Wed 01/22 10:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' proposed briefing schedules it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction5 is due on January 24, 2020 and Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due on January 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/22/2020. (lcsd)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 01/22 11:40 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 1/24/2020. Reply due by 1/28/2020. (tb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
notice Notice of QC Tue 01/21 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re15 Notice of Appearance; emailed to morgan_frankel@legal.senate.gov, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel must contact Attorney Admissions at: (202) 354-3110, regarding status. (ztd, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC Tue 01/21 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re17 Notice of Appearance; emailed to grant_vinik@legal.senate.gov, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel must contact Attorney Admissions at: (202) 354-3110, regarding status (ztd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
17 17 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Raymond Vinik on behalf of TED CRUZ, LINDSEY GRAHAM, MITCH MCCONNELL, RAND PAUL (Vinik, Grant)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Caballero on behalf of TED CRUZ, LINDSEY GRAHAM, MITCH MCCONNELL, RAND PAUL (Caballero, Thomas)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan John Frankel on behalf of TED CRUZ, LINDSEY GRAHAM, MITCH MCCONNELL, RAND PAUL (Frankel, Morgan)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M. Bryan on behalf of TED CRUZ, LINDSEY GRAHAM, MITCH MCCONNELL, RAND PAUL (Bryan, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
13 13 misc Errata Thu 01/16 2:47 PM
ERRATA by MARTIN MCMAHON. (McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC Thu 01/16 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re12 Motion to Expedite; emailed to mm@martinmcmahonlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI. In future, pleading must contain an electronic signature. (ztth, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
12 12 motion Expedite Wed 01/15 3:40 PM
MOTION to Expedite hearing for injunctive relief by MARTIN MCMAHON (McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 01/15 10:12 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due in chambers by 1/17/2020. (tb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
order .Order Tue 01/14 5:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall meet and confer to propose a briefing schedule for the Motion for Preliminary Injunction5 and other pending motions. Plaintiff shall contact counsel for the opposing parties, including counsel for the Department of Justice. The parties shall email chambers the proposed schedule by January 17, 2020. The court's email address should be used only when the parties are specifically directed by the court to respond by email and should not be used for general correspondence. Any filings must be made on the public docket. Any inquiries may be directed to the Judge's Courtroom Deputy Tim Bradley Tim_Bradley@dcd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 01/14/2020. (lcsd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/07 4:17 PM
NOTICE Service mailing receipts by MARTIN MCMAHON (McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/06 6:02 PM
NOTICE Affidavits of service mailing by MARTIN MCMAHON (McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/03 4:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against TED CRUZ, LINDSEY GRAHAM, MITCH MCCONNELL, RAND PAUL filed by MARTIN MCMAHON.(McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Expedite Fri 01/03 4:25 PM
MOTION to Expedite interim injunctive relief by MARTIN MCMAHON (McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Leave to File Document Fri 01/03 4:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to File 2nd amended complaint by MARTIN MCMAHON (McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
order .Order Fri 01/03 5:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs, in civil actions, who proceed pro se (i.e., without an attorney) have a responsibility to comply with this courts Local Civil Rules as well as the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, including Rules 4 and 5 which require service of papers, including the complaint and motions, upon each defendant. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, 5. Inasmuch as Plaintiff, who is an attorney and a member of the District of Columbia Bar, has brought this action against federal governmental officials, Plaintiff is hereby reminded of his obligation to serve a copy of the summons and complaint in a manner that complies with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff's failure to comply with these rules may result in dismissal of this action. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Plaintiff is also reminded of his obligation to serve a copy of his motions in a manner that complies with Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, including by permissible means stated in Rule 5(b)(2). The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/3/2020. (lcsd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Corrected Docket Entry Tue 01/07 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re9 Amended Complaint was entered in error and has been added as an exhibit to docket entry no.7 pending ruling by the Court. (ztd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
6 6 20 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/02 3:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against TED CRUZ, LINDSEY GRAHAM, MITCH MCCONNELL, RAND PAUL filed by MARTIN MCMAHON.(McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 01/02 3:52 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MARTIN MCMAHON (McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2019
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/26 9:03 AM
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan pursuant to Minute Order dated 12/23/19. Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 12/23 11:03 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to TED CRUZ, LINDSEY GRAHAM, MITCH MCCONNELL, RAND PAUL.(zrdj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/23 10:54 AM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zrdj)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 12/23 4:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to transfer this case to the Calendar and Case Management Committee for random assignment. Plaintiff's2 Notice of Related Case maintains that his instant action, which seeks to vindicate his alleged "right based on the Ninth Amendment, as an American citizen, to witness an authentic impeachment trial,"1 Compl. at 2, "grows out of the same event or transaction" as In re Application of the Comm. on the Judiciary, U.S. House of Representatives , No. 19-gj-48 (BAH) (D.D.C. Oct 25, 2019).2 Notice of Related Case at 1. Moreover, in an apparent typo, he asserts the two cases "involve[] the validity or infringement of the same patent." Id. The plaintiff is wrong, as "these cases involve different claims" and circumstances. Trump v. Comm. on Ways & Means, U.S. House of Representatives , No. 19-cv-2173 (TNM), 2019 WL 3388537, at *2 (D.D.C. July 25, 2019). This action concerns the procedures and participants in a potential Senate impeachment trial, while In re Application of the Comm. on the Judiciary involved the propriety of disclosing materials gathered by a grand jury. Thus, "these distinct claims present discrete issues of fact to be resolved making a related case designation wholly inappropriate." Comm. on the Judiciary of the U.S. House of Representatives v. Donald F. McGahn II , No. 19-cv-2379, Memorandum Opinion and Order at 7 (D.D.C. Aug. 14, 2019) (internal quotation marks omitted). Although both cases involve, to different degrees, impeachment, that superficial similarity is not enough to overcome the heavy burden a plaintiff bears to circumvent random assignment of cases in this Court. Cf. Dakota Rural Action v. U.S. Dep't of Agric. , No. 18-cv-2852 (BAH), 2019 WL 1440134, at *1 (D.D.C. Apr. 1, 2019). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 23, 2019. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 22, 2019
3 3 misc Errata Sun 12/22 4:28 PM
ERRATA Corrected Cover sheet date by MARTIN MCMAHON. (McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2019
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Thu 12/19 5:38 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MARTIN MCMAHON. Case related to Case No. 19-gj-00048. (McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/18 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6658920) filed by MARTIN MCMAHON.(McMahon, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet