Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-14578

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:19-ap-01513
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2019
Terminated:Jun 05, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.
Represented By
Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Roes 1-100
Represented By
Roes 1-100
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Louise Carlsen
20542 Como Lane
Porter Ranch, CA 91326
Represented By
Rachel Louise Carlsen
contact info
Trustee
Carolyn A Dye (TR)
Law Offices of Carolyn Dye 3435 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 990
Los Angeles, CA 90010
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, June 05, 2020
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/05 4:20 PM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-1513 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/07 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
13 13 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Tue 05/05 11:03 AM
ORDER Approving Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding as to Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc. with prejudice; (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/5/2020. (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
12 12 misc Notice of Lodgment Mon 05/04 2:21 PM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Barasch, Adam)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation By Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc. and Rachel Louise Carlsen for Dismissal of the Adversary Complaint with Prejudice Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc. filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.
11 11 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 05/04 11:27 AM
Stipulation By Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc. and Rachel Louise Carlsen for Dismissal of the Adversary Complaint with Prejudice Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc. (Barasch, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2020
10 10 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 03/06 12:26 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Other) Related [+]; RULING- S/C CONT'D. TO 6/2/20 @ 2PM; STATUS REPORT BY 5/19/20; COMPLETE MEDIATION BY 6/2/20; LODGE ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR BY 3/27/20; DEFENDANT TO LODGE SCHEDULING ORDER; (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, March 02, 2020
9 9 misc Status report Mon 03/02 8:23 AM
Status report (Joint) Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Barasch, Adam)
Related: [-] 3 Another Summons Issued
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/11 9:00 AM
Answer to Complaint (Corrected Amended) Filed by Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.. (Barasch, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
7 7 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 02/10 3:05 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. DOCUMENT MUST HAVE THE UPCOMING STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING DATE UNDER THE CAPTION OF THE DOCUMENT; DOCUMENT MUST BE SIGNED AND THE PROOF OF SERVICE MUST HAVE THE CORRECT JUDGE SERVED FOR THIS CASE AND COMPLETELY FILLED OUT. Related [+] (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.,6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/10 12:33 PM
Answer to Complaint (Amended) Filed by Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.. (Barasch, Adam)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/10 12:19 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.. (Barasch, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Fri 01/24 4:24 PM
Proof of service of Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen Related [+]. With proof of service; (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, January 09, 2020
3 3 court Another Summons Issued Thu 01/09 9:54 AM
Another Summons Issued on Roes 1-100 Date Issued 1/9/2020, Answer Due 2/10/2020; Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc. Date Issued 1/9/2020, Answer Due 2/10/2020 Related [+] - Original Summons was not mailed to the Plaintiff; Status hearing to be held on 3/3/2020 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen
Monday, December 30, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 12/30 3:26 PM
Summons Issued on Roes 1-100 Date Issued 12/30/2019, Answer Due 1/29/2020; Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc. Date Issued 12/30/2019, Answer Due 1/29/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/3/2020 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rachel Louise Carlsen
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/17 1:56 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-01513. Complaint by Rachel Louise Carlsen against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. . (Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) ,(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) ,(72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (Fierro, Viridiana) CORRECTION: Incorrect defendant name entered. Complaint by Rachel Louise Carlsen against Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc. Modified on 12/17/2019 (Arias, Jose)
Related: [-]