Member Case
Lead case is: 7:14-bk-22415

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:14-bk-22421
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2014
Terminated:Oct 21, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Open MRI of Yorktown LLC
4 Beaverbrook Rd
Lincoln Park, NJ 07035-1796
Represented By
Dawn Kirby Arnold
Delbello Donnellan Weingarten Wise & Wiederkehr, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 02/09/2018 11:30 AM EST
Tuesday, April 01, 2014
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-22421 [misc,824] (1213.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10021928. Fee amount 1213.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A due 04/15/2014. Schedule B due 04/15/2014. Schedule D due 04/15/2014. Schedule E due 04/15/2014. Schedule F due 04/15/2014. Schedule G due 04/15/2014. Schedule H due 04/15/2014. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 04/15/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/15/2014. Atty Disclosure State. due 04/15/2014. Employee Income Record Due: 04/15/2014. Incomplete Filings due by 04/15/2014, Small Business Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/26/2015, Filed by Dawn Kirby Arnold of DelBello Donnellan Weingarten Wise & Wiederkehr, LLP on behalf of Open MRI of Yorktown LLC. (Arnold, Dawn)
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion for Joint Administration under Case No. 14-22415 filed by Dawn Kirby Arnold on behalf of Open MRI of Yorktown LLC. (Arnold, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order