Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-04969
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2019
Terminated:Aug 03, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 16, 2020 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
MARTHA M JOHNSON
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, August 03, 2020
10 10 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/04 10:22 AM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A only, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 07/31 4:18 PM
ORDER - The motions to withdraw as counsel of record without substitution in the cases identified on Exhibit A are GRANTED. Attorney Louise R. Caro and the law firm of Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC are relieved of any further obligation for representation of those plaintiffs. The Clerk is directed to update the individual dockets to reflect the last known address of the respective plaintiffs, as indicated on Exhibit A. The Clerk is further directed to mail a copy of this Order to the respective plaintiffs at the address provided. Unless and until substitute counsel appears on a plaintiffs behalf,the Court will assume the plaintiff has elected to proceed pro se. Attorney LOUISE R CARO and JENNIFER R LIAKOS terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/31/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
8 8 motion Sealed Motion - Sealed PDF Thu 07/16 3:09 PM
SEALED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF MARTHA M. JOHNSON WITHOUT SUBSTITUTION by MARTHA M JOHNSON. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 07/16 3:25 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:8 SEALED MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Without Substitution (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/08 9:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LOUISE R CARO on behalf of MARTHA M JOHNSON (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 10:57 AM
Summons Issued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 02/19 11:03 PM
NOTICE of filing Summons to Issue (OPC) by MARTHA M JOHNSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 1:32 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 02/10 6:26 PM
NOTICE of Filing Summons to Issue by MARTHA M. JOHNSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, December 31, 2019
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 12/31 9:05 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, filed by MARTHA M. JOHNSON. (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
1 1 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/19 8:25 AM
ORDER - Short Form Complaint must be filed on or before 1/2/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (erl)
Related: [-]