Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-33787

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Katherine A Constantine
Case #: 3:19-ap-03111
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2019
Terminated:Feb 28, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Christopher Robert Champine
15051 Greenhaven Drive #211
Burnsville, MN 55306
Plaintiff
Minnesota Department of Employment and Economic Development
332 Minnesota Street
St Paul, MN 55101
Represented By
Rory H Foley
Attorney General'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, February 28, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 02/28 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 02/28/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 02/28 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 02/28/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 02/28 3:09 PM
Disposition of adversary 3:19-ap-3111. Judgment For PLAINTIFF. Disposition: GRANTED. (Alicia MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 02/28 3:12 PM
Adversary case 3:19-ap-3111 closed (Alicia MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
8 8 order MNB Judgment Wed 02/26 4:31 PM
Judgment for adv 3:19-ap-3111. (Laura MNB)
Related: [-]
7 7 order MNB Order (Generic) Wed 02/26 4:14 PM
Order Re: Related [+] (Laura MNB)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
Thursday, February 20, 2020
6 6 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Thu 02/20 3:38 PM
Stipulation filed by Minnesota Department of Employment and Economic Development and Christopher Robert Champine. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: repayment agreement(Foley, Rory)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 21, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/21 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2019
4 4 misc MNB Certificate of service Thu 12/19 10:48 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Minnesota Department of Employment and Economic Development.(Foley, Rory)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
3 3 court MNB Pro bono notice to defendants Thu 12/19 9:17 AM
Pro bono notice to defendant re:1 Complaint. (Maurya MNBS)
Related: [-]
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Thu 12/19 9:16 AM
Summons issued on Christopher Robert Champine Date Issued 12/19/2019, Answer Due 1/21/2020 (Maurya MNBS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Wed 12/18 3:51 PM
Adversary case 19-03111 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (65 (Dischargeability - other)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Minnesota Department of Employment and Economic Development against Christopher Robert Champine. Fee Amount $350 (Foley, Rory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)