Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-05053
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2019
Terminated:Aug 03, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Jun 20, 2020 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
ASHLEY LOVELL
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 03, 2020
11 11 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/04 10:22 AM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A only, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 07/20 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by ASHLEY LOVELL (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
9 9 3 pgs order Order Fri 07/17 3:14 PM
ORDER granting 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by ASHLEY LOVELL. Counsel is directed to promptly provide the plaintiffs with a copy of this Order and to file a written notice of compliance with the Court, together with an address for the plaintiffs where all future filings and correspondence involving their cases should be directed. Thereafter, Behram V. Parekh, Esq. and the law firm of Kirtland & Packard LLP are relieved of any further obligation for representation of the plaintiffs in those matters. Unless and until substitute counsel appears on a plaintiff's behalf, the Court will assume the plaintiff has elected to proceed pro se. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/17/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 07/13 8:47 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
8 8 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 07/10 3:02 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ASHLEY LOVELL. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 02/28 4:30 PM
Summons Issued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 02/20 4:46 PM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by ASHLEY LOVELL (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
5 5 service Summons Reissued Tue 02/04 9:24 AM
Summons Reissued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 01/31 12:37 PM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by ASHLEY LOVELL (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, January 06, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/06 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 1:43 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, filed by ASHLEY LOVELL. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons BMS,
Att: 3 Summons Ot Am,
Att: 4 Summons Ot Ph
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
1 1 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/23 4:09 PM
ORDER - Short Form Complaint must be filed on or before 1/6/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (erl)
Related: [-]