Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-05042
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2019
Terminated:Jul 14, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 20, 2020 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN MUCCIO
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
8 8 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 07/14 2:19 PM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. The Clerk is directed to enter this Order on the docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A and then to close those cases for administrative purposes. At the expiration of 30 days without activity, the Clerk must close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/14/2021. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
7 7 service Summons Reissued Thu 02/20 3:32 PM
Summons Reissued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 02/20 11:51 AM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by JOHN MUCCIO (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
5 5 service Summons Reissued Tue 02/04 9:19 AM
Summons Reissued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 01/31 12:45 PM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by JOHN MUCCIO (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 01/08 10:18 AM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, filed by JOHN MUCCIO. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons BMS,
Att: 3 Summons Ot Am,
Att: 4 Summons Ot Ph
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
1 1 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/23 2:41 PM
ORDER - Short Form Complaint must be filed on or before 1/6/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (erl)
Related: [-]