City of Waynesboro, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46152 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Western, 5:19-cv-00058 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 02, 2020 1:37 PM EST |
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Craig Landau
|
|
Defendant
John Stewart
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Timney
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
jonathan Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insource, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Henry Schein Inc.
|
|
Defendant
General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Russell Gasdia
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
|
|
Plaintiff
The City of Waynesboro, Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/02/2020 1:37 PM EST |
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of Waynesboro Circuit Court, case number CL19-148. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3207553), filed by Actavis, LLC.(jv) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment to CCS, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1. Complaint/ccs as filed in City of Waynesboro Circuit Court | ||
2 | 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to Actavis, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response.[LINK:Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form.] This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated of Supplemental Notice of Removal(Broughton, Turner)[Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 | ||
4 | 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
5 | 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
6 | 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) Modified on 8/19/2019 to reflect correct docket event (jv). [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner Anderson Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
8 | 8 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by The City of Waynesboro, Virginia. (Spivey, William) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
9 | 9 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by The City of Waynesboro, Virginia. (Spivey, William) Modified on 8/19/2019 to add gavel (jv). [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Waynesboro City Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/22/2019. (jv) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Remand . filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) Modified on 8/27/2019 to reflect correct event (kld). [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 REPLY TO RESPONSE to re9 MOTION to Remand . filed by The City of Waynesboro, Virginia. (Spivey, William) Modified on 8/27/2019 to reflect event type (kld). [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,9 MOTION to Remand . filed by Actavis, LLC.(Fee, James) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,9 MOTION to Remand . filed by The City of Waynesboro, Virginia. (Spivey, William) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court for the City of Waynesboro, CL19-000148, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.)(kld) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 158 pgs First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal | ||
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 MOTION to Stay by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17 Brief / Memorandum in Support re16 MOTION to Stay . filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit A | ||
18 | 18 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re16 MOTION to Stay ,17 Brief / Memorandum in Support, . filed by The City of Waynesboro, Virginia.(Spivey, William) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
19 | 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION to Stay . filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
20 | 20 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(Massie, Wade) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy | ||
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER granting16 Motion to Stay Case; The case is STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether the case will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/18/2019. (jv) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
22 | 22 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Johan Conrod, Jr (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
23 | 23 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from Northern District of Ohio; MDL No. 2804 (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
24 | 24 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00058. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |