Clark County v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-46168 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Nevada, 2:19-cv-01616 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 02, 2020 11:54 AM EST |
Defendant
Rosebay Medical Company L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Kapoor
|
|
Defendant
SUNRISE LEE
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aida B Maxsam
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PLP Associates Holdings L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven A Holper, M.D., Professional Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Rowan
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD M. SIMON
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 200, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Babich
|
|
Defendant
Beacon Company
|
|
Defendant
Alec Burlakoff
|
|
Defendant
C & R Pharmacy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Indiana L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS RX Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Tennessee Distribution, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 414, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 6 Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Technologies LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MICHAEL J. GURRY
|
|
Defendant
Holper Out-Patients Medical Center, Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven A. Holper, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clark County
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
Terminated: 09/13/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
Terminated: 09/13/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/02/2020 11:53 AM EST |
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | ||
Party Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. terminated pursuant to6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court for Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-17-765828-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5701594) by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/7/2018.(Martin, Anna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 213 pgs Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration re Removal, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Express Scripts, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Anna) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Express Scripts Holding Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Anna) Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation added Modified on 9/17/2019 (MMM). [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
4 | 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/13/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/28/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Adriana Riviere-Badell and Julian W Park to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/28/2019. (no image attached) (ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice; filed by Plaintiff Clark County. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Sunday, September 15, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Clark County. Responses due by 9/29/2019. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - City of Reno v. Purdue Pharma - Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - State of Delaware v. Purdue Pharma - Memorandum, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - WV v. McKesson - Memorandum Opinion & Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - County of Anderson v. Rite Aid - Order, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Weber County - Memorandum Decision & Order, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Uintah County v. Purdue Pharma - Memorandum Decision & Order, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Order Regarding Remands, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - CMO, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Dinwiddie City v. Purdue Pharma, LP, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Order Directing Answer, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Transcript (Excerpts) | ||
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Defendants Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P. (Fears, Chad) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Mark S. Cheffo, Mara Cusker Gonzalez, Lindsay Zanello to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/1/2019. (no image attached) (MMM) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
10 | 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No.8 . Attorney Hayley Miller is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John Andrew Smith to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/4/2019. (no image attached) (MMM) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
12 | 12 ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal, filed by Aida B Maxsam. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/4/2019.(Barr, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
13 | 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Aida B Maxsam. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Barr, Jeffrey) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE re 1 Petition for Removal by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Hutchison, Mark) Modified on 9/24/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM). [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added. (Lundvall, Patricia) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
16 | 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Lester C. Houtz and Alex J. Harris to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/8/2019. (no image attached) (MMM) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
17 | 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hutchison, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
19 | 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation added. (Rickard, Jarrod) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
20 | 20 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Hutchison, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
21 | 21 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Hutchison, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
22 | 22 RESPONSE to21 Motion to Stay Case, by Plaintiff Clark County. Replies due by 10/7/2019. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - MDL Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Vacate CTO, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - VA Order | ||
23 | 23 RESPONSE to7 Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Replies due by 10/7/2019. (Hutchison, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
24 | 24 VIEW 28 corrected image to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John Andrew "Jack" Smith and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian K. Terry (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5721107) by Defendant Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Terry, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
25 | 25 CLERK'S NOTICE and Attorney Action Required to ECF No.24 . Missing a Certificate of Good Standing. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to24 . Do NOT link to this notice. (no image attached) (MMM) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
26 | 26 First STIPULATION re Discovery Stipulation And Order To Stay Discovery Pending Resolution Of Plaintiff's Motion To Remand re7 Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Plaintiff Clark County. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
27 | 27 ORDER granting26 Stipulation; Status Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
28 | 28 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re24 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Terry, Brian) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
32 | 32 ORDER granting24 Verified Petition for Permission John A. Smith to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brian K. Terry. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/4/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
29 | 29 REPLY to Response to21 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Hutchison, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
30 | 30 REPLY to Response to7 Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Plaintiff Clark County. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Notice of Removal | ||
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
31 | 31 MOTION to Shorten Time re7 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiff Clark County. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit In Support of Plaintiff CC Motion for Order Shortening Time, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - CTO - 113 | ||
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
33 | 33 NOTICE Clark County's Combined Supplement to its Motion to Remand [Dkt 7] and Opposition to Walgreens' Motion to Stay Proceedings [Dkt 22] by Clark County re7 Motion to Remand to State Court,,22 Response. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Motion to Remand | ||
34 | 34 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Hutchison, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
35 | 35 RESPONSE to31 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Replies due by 10/21/2019. (Hutchison, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
36 | 36 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by C & R Pharmacy. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Daehnke, Patricia) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
37 | 37 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No.36 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
38 | 38 NOTICE of Federal Preliminary Injunctive Order by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.. (Fears, Chad) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
39 | 39 REPLY to Response to31 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Plaintiff Clark County. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Motion to Remand and Denying Motion to Stay | ||
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
40 | 40 ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint contained within 1 Petition for Removal filed by Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC.(Smith, John) Modified on 10/24/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM). [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
41 | 41 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, John) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
42 | 42 RESPONSE to38 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Clark County. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Order | ||
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
43 | 43 NOTICE of Second Amended Bankruptcy Court Order Extending Injunction by Aida B Maxsam. (Barr, Jeffrey) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Second Amended Preliminary Injunction Order | ||
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
44 | 44 MDL Transfer Order signed by MDL Panel on 12/18/2019. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
45 | 45 Text Only MDL Minute Order re Transfer Order. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
46 | 46 Certified MDL Transfer Order transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
47 | 47 TRANSMITTAL of case to the Northern District of Ohio. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 12/23/2019.] | |
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
48 | 48 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Nevada. Case number 2:19-cv-01616. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |