Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 2:19-cv-06078
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Jun 20, 2020 5:25 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
GREG ROMAN
Represented By
MARGARET M. DIBIANCA
Clark Hill PC
contact info
DAVID J WALTON
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
WILLIAM RIESER
Sidney Gold & Associates
contact info
KEVIN LEVINE
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
TRACI M. GREENBERG
Sidney L. Gold & Associates, PC
contact info
SIDNEY L. GOLD
Sidney L. Gold & Associates, PC
contact info
LEIGH ANN BENSON
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Counter Defendant
MARNIE O'BRIEN
Represented By
ERICA A. SHIKUNOV
Pond Lehocky Stern Giordano
contact info
Defendant
DANIEL PIPES
Represented By
DAVID J WALTON
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
LEIGH ANN BENSON
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
GREG ROMAN
Represented By
MARGARET M. DIBIANCA
Clark Hill PC
contact info
DAVID J WALTON
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
WILLIAM RIESER
Sidney Gold & Associates
contact info
KEVIN LEVINE
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
TRACI M. GREENBERG
Sidney L. Gold & Associates, PC
contact info
SIDNEY L. GOLD
Sidney L. Gold & Associates, PC
contact info
LEIGH ANN BENSON
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
THE MIDDLE EAST FORUM
Represented By
DAVID J WALTON
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
LEIGH ANN BENSON
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
MARNIE O'BRIEN
Represented By
ERICA A. SHIKUNOV
Pond Lehocky Stern Giordano
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
MATTHEW EBERT
354 PIXLEY PLACE
WEST DEPTFORD, NJ 08096
ThirdParty Plaintiff
GREG ROMAN
Represented By
MARGARET M. DIBIANCA
Clark Hill PC
contact info
DAVID J WALTON
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
WILLIAM RIESER
Sidney Gold & Associates
contact info
KEVIN LEVINE
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
TRACI M. GREENBERG
Sidney L. Gold & Associates, PC
contact info
SIDNEY L. GOLD
Sidney L. Gold & Associates, PC
contact info
LEIGH ANN BENSON
Cozen O'Connor
contact info

GPO Dec 14 2020
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 12/14/20. 12/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt, )
GPO Dec 14 2020
ORDER OF 12/14/20 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (ECF NO. 51), PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION (ECF NO. 54), AND ANY RESPONSE THERETO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL IS DENIED; THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TEMPORARILY STAY THE DEPOSITION SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 12, AND 13 (ECF NO. 62) IS HEREBY TERMINATED. THE PARTIES SHALL AGREE ON A NEW DATE TO HOLD MR. ROMAN'S DEPOSITION, WHICH IS TO TAKE PLACE NO LATER THAN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 12/14/20. 12/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
GPO Jan 19 2021
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 1/19/21. 1/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt, )
GPO Jan 19 2021
ORDER OF 1/19/21 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (DOC. NO. 26) AND PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION (DOC. 27), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS GRANTED; AND COUNT II OF THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 1/19/21. 1/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 03, 2021
92 92 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/03 4:41 PM
THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER OF 5/3/21. A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 29, 2021 AT 1:00PM. ETC. PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN JULY 9, 2021. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN JULY 16, 2021. RESPONSES NO LATER THAN JULY 23, 2021. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN CHAMBERS ON JULY 28, 2021 AT 1:30PM. THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON JULY 30, 2021 AT 9:00AM. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 5/3/21. 5/3/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
91 91 minutes Status Conference Thu 04/29 3:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Status Conference held on 4/29/21. (mas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
90 90 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/26 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB F. WILLIAMS on behalf of DANIEL PIPES, GREG ROMAN, THE MIDDLE EAST FORUM with Certificate of Service(WILLIAMS, JAKOB)
Related: [-]