Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Brian J Davis
Referred: Monte C Richardson
Case #: 3:14-cv-00368
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause46:31301 Commercial Instruments and Maritime Liens
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2014
Terminated:Aug 20, 2014
Last checked: Friday Dec 12, 2014 2:43 AM EST
Defendant
Research Vessel Arctic Discoverer, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., In Rem
Plaintiff
Clay County Port, Inc.
Represented By
Phillip Arthur Buhler
Moseley, Prichard, Parrish, Knight & Jones
contact info
Richard Keith Jones
Moseley, Prichard, Parrish, Knight & Jones
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 30, 2014
30 30 CONFIRMATION OF SALE by Clay County Port, Inc. re29 Order on Motion for Confirmation (KJR)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 29, 2014
29 29 ORDER granting27 Motion for Confirmation of Sale. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/29/2014. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 25, 2014
28 28 PROPOSED ORDER for Confirmation of Sale by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 9/26/2014 to edit text per chambers(KJR).
Related: [-]
27 27 MOTION for Confirmation of Sale by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part24 Motion for Award of Mashal Sale to CCP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/25/2014. (RTL)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 19, 2014
25 25 NOTICE, USM-285 form regarding Auction Record by Clay County Port, Inc. (KJR)
Related: [-]
24 24 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Marshal Sale be Awarded to CCP by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 20, 2014
23 23 JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order entered, August 19, 2014, Motion for Entry of Judgment by Default is Granted. Plaintiff shall recover $39,392.95 from the Research Vessel Arctic Discoverer, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc. (the "vessel"), in rem: $38,625.97 for dockage and services provided to the Vessel through April 12, 2014; and $766.98 in costs. Plaintiff shall also recover $209.45 per day for substitute custodian fees and $5.00 per day for insurance costs, from April 12, 2014, through the date of sale of the Vessel. See Order for further details. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/20/2014. (KJR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 19, 2014
22 22 ORDER Adopting21 Report and Recommendations; Granting16 Motion for Default Judgment and Granting20 Motion for Order of Sale. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly, terminate any pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/19/2014. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 07, 2014
21 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re16 Motion for default judgment against Research Vessel Arctic Discoverer, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., In Rem;20 Motion for Order of Sale. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/3/2014. (NTM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 03, 2014
20 20 MOTION for Order of Sale by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard)
Related: [-]
19 19 AFFIDAVIT of Richard K. Jones in Support of Costs by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard)
Related: [-]
18 18 AFFIDAVIT of Richard K. Jones in Support of Custodia Legis Expenses by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard)
Related: [-]
17 17 AFFIDAVIT of David L. Peden In Support of CCP's Claim by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION for default judgment against Research Vessel Arctic Discoverer, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., In Rem by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 22, 2014
15 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Research Vessel Arctic Discoverer, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., In Rem (CKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2014
14 14 MOTION for default Against Defendant Vessel by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2014
13 13 AFFIDAVIT of Publisher Clay Today Notice of Action in Rem by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard)
Related: [-]
12 12 AFFIDAVIT of Publisher Financial News Proof of Publication of Notice of Action by Clay County Port, Inc.. (Jones, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2014
11 11 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit Action in Rem and Arrest of Vessel to Vessel Owner by Clay County Port, Inc. (Jones, Richard) Modified on 4/25/2014, to edit text(HC).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2014
10 10 RETURN of service executed on 04/11/2014 by Clay County Port, Inc. as to Research Vessel Arctic Discoverer, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., In Rem. (HC)
Related: [-]
9 9 RETURN of service executed on 04/12/2014 by Clay County Port, Inc. as to Research Vessel Arctic Discoverer, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., In Rem. (HC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2014
7 7 ORDER granting2 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/3/2014. (NTM)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/3/2014. (NTM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2014
5 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/2/2014.(EAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Management Report Form,
Att: 2 Consent Letter and Form
4 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by All Plaintiffs. (Jones, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2014
3 3 NOTICE of Filing Consent and Indemnification Agreement by Clay County Port, Inc. re2 MOTION to Appoint Custodian. (HC)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Clay County Port, Inc.(HC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 COMPLAINT against Research Vessel Arctic Discoverer, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., In Rem (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX12048) filed by Clay County Port, Inc.(HC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order for arrest in REM