California Southern District Court
Judge:Gonzalo P Curiel
Referred: Andrew G Schopler
Case #: 3:14-cv-00751
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:0001 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2014
Terminated:Jun 27, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 5:10 AM PST
Defendant
SourceAmerica
Represented By
Allen R. Bachman
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Mason R. Winters
Venable LLP
contact info
Kevin W Alexander
Gordon And Rees
contact info
John W. Treece
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amy Pesapane Lally
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
John P. Cooley
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel J. Cragg
Eckland And Blando LLP
contact info
Jared M. Reams
Eckland And Blando LLP
contact info
Mark J. Blando
Eckland And Blando LLP
contact info
Joseph Thomas Ergastolo
Wright, L'Estrange & Ergastolo
contact info
John H L'Estrange, Jr
Wright, L'Estrange & Ergastolo
contact info
Andrew Edward Schouten
Wright, L'Estrange & Ergastolo
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CW Resources
Terminated: 08/20/2014
Represented By
Sarah E Christenson
Callahan Thompson Sherman & Caudhill LLP
contact info
Robert W. Thompson
Callahan Thompson Sherman & Caudill, LLP
contact info
Kathleen M Hartman
Callahan, Thompson, Sherman & Caudill LLP
contact info
Defendant
Corporate Source, Inc.
Terminated: 08/20/2014
Represented By
Alfred De La Cruz
Manning & Kass Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Goodwill Industries of Southern California
Terminated: 08/20/2014
Represented By
Brian C. Lake
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Charles Howard Samel
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Anne B. Beaumont
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Matthew B. du Mee
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Job Options, Inc.
Terminated: 08/20/2014
Represented By
Merrili Leigh Escue
Dla Piper
contact info
Jeffrey M Shohet
Dla Piper Us LLP
contact info
Veronica Jackson
Dla Piper Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kent, Campa & Kate, Inc.
Terminated: 08/20/2014
Represented By
Charles E. Walton
Walton Law Group LLC
contact info
Dan Bacal
Law Offices Of Dan Bacal
contact info
Defendant
Lakeview Center, Inc.
Terminated: 08/20/2014
Represented By
William Purdy
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Amanda M. Lorenz
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Edward J. Beder
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Defendant
National Council of SourceAmerica Employers
Terminated: 08/20/2014
Represented By
Kathleen P Wallace
Jones Day
contact info
Jeffrey Alan LeVee
Jones Day
contact info
Rachel Hadass Zernik
Jones Day
contact info
Amy Pesapane Lally
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Opportunity Village, Inc.
Terminated: 08/20/2014
Represented By
Daniel J. Scully, Jr.
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Roger G Perkins
Morris Polich And Purdy, LLP
contact info
Jennifer Woods
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Patricia M. Sulzbach
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
John D. Dakmak
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Bret S. Wacker
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Defendant
Pride Industries, Inc.
Terminated: 08/20/2014
Represented By
Jon F. Cieslak
Cooley LLP
contact info
Michael A Attanasio
Cooley Godward Kronish
contact info
Craig Edward TenBroeck
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
ServiceSource, Inc.
Terminated: 08/20/2014
Represented By
William Purdy
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Amanda M. Lorenz
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Edward J. Beder
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Ginn Group, Inc.
Terminated: 05/14/2014
Represented By
Devin J. Stone
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 20 2014
ORDER: (1) Granting Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 23, 47, 48, 51, 53, 55, 66, 85, 86, 87); (2) Denying as Moot 112 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; The Court Dismisses Plaintiff's causes of action against Defendants for violations of section 1 of the Sherman Act in their entirety for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's breach of contract claim against SourceAmerica remains. The Court Grants Plaintiff thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint to correct the deficiencies identified herein. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/20/2014. (srm)
GPO Feb 05 2015
ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 194 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application; (2) Modifying Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on 195 Plaintiff's Motion For Certification Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b): Responses due by 2/20/2015, Replies due by 2/27/2015. Motion Hearing Reset for 3/6/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/4/2015. (srm)
GPO Jun 01 2015
ORDER Denying 210 Portco, Inc. Leave to File Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/1/15. (dlg)
GPO Jun 01 2015
ORDER Denying 223 Ex Parte Application of Source America For Leave to File Notice of New Facts in Support of Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/1/2015. (jao)
GPO Jun 03 2015
AMENDED ORDER Granting 212 Request for Entry of Rule 54(b) Judgment and Denying 218 Joint Motion to Stay. The Court Dismisses Without Leave to Amend claims one through nine of Plaintiff's FAC, Grants Plaintiff's request for entry of judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b), and Denies Defendants' joint motion to stay. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/3/15. (dlg) (Main Document 234 replaced on 6/5/2015 per dj chambers request (dlg).
GPO Jan 05 2016
ORDER Granting 246 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Complaint; Granting 247 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/5/16. (dlg)
GPO Feb 17 2016
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Regarding Defendant's Ex Parte (251)Motion: (1) to Disqualify Plaintiff's counsel; (2) to Revoke Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniel J. Cragg; (3) for Protective Order; and (4) for Expedited Discovery: No later than March 2, 2016, any party to this action may file written objections. Any Reply to the Objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than seven (7) days from service of any filed Objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 2/17/16.(dlg)
GPO Jun 29 2016
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 309 Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss SourceAmerica's Amended Counterclaims. The Court denies Counterdefendants' motion to dismiss SourceAmerica's CIPA and UCL claims to the extent described herein and grants Counterdefendant's motion to dismiss SourceAmerica's requests for damages under the UCL, attorney's fees, and punitive damages under the CIPA. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/29/16. (dlg)
GPO Aug 11 2016
ORDER Granting Motions to Seal (re Doc. Nos. 298, 302, 304). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/11/2016. (dls)
GPO Aug 16 2016
ORDER Adopting in Part and Declining in Part Magistrate Judge's 288 Report and Recommendation. The Court hereby: GRANTS SourceAmerica's motion to disqualify 251 Daniel J. Cragg and Eckland and Blando LLP; GRANTS SourceAmerica's motion to revoke Daniel J. Cragg's pro hac vice admission; DENIES AS MOOT SourceAmercia;s motion for expedited discovery 327; OVERRULES the Parties; objections in all other respects; and DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE SourceAmerica's motioriel on 8/16/16. (dlg) (jao).n for a protective order. SourceAmerica may refile a motion for a protective order with the Magistrate Judge in light of this Courts order. The Court DENIES Bona Fide's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Cu
GPO Oct 04 2016
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant SourceAmerica's 337 Ex Parte Application for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 10/3/16. (dlg)
GPO Apr 14 2017
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 360. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 4/14/17.(dlg)
GPO Jul 12 2017
ORDER Granting 464 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File to File Sur-Reply Responding to Defendant's Evidentiary Objections. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/12/17. (dlg)
GPO Jul 24 2017
ORDER denying Defendant's 370 Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/24/2017. (fth)
GPO May 14 2018
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Counterdefendants' 493 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court grants summary judgment in favor of Counterdefendants on SourceAmerica's UCL claims, and it denies summary judgment on SourceAmerica's CIPA claims. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/14/2018. (mpl)
GPO Jul 19 2018
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Substantive Motions (519, 520, 521, 526, 572, 532); Granting Motions for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (522, 523); and Granting Two Motions to Seal (524, 528 and Calling for Further Briefing as to one Motion to Seal (530). The Court defers a ruling as to the motion to seal found at ECF No. 530 and orders SourceAmerica to file a memorandum, within seven days, justifying the redactions proposed by that motion. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/18/18. (dlg)
GPO Jul 31 2018
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 530 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Bona Fide shall, within five days of the date this order is filed, withdraw its motion to exclude Mary Karen Wills (ECF No. 532) and all attached exhibits, and refile these documents publicly except for the sealing approved above. This refiling of Bona Fide's motion to exclude Mary Karen Wills will not alter the previously set briefing schedule and hearing date. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/31/2018. (rmc)
GPO Aug 14 2018
ORDER Denying 536 Motion to Seal Previously Filed Documents; Granting 542, 554 Motions for Leave to File Excess Pages; Deferring Ruling on Motions to File Under Seal (544, 547, 551, 556); Denying 563 Motion to Strike Bona Fide's Opposition to SourceAmerica's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting 567 Motion to File Untimely Memorandum. The Court defers a ruling on the motions to file documents under seal (ECF Nos. 544, 547, 551, 556). Within fourteen days of the date of this order, SourceAmerica shall file a memorandum explaining the need to seal. All reply memoranda relating to the substantive motions discussed in the Court's order setting forth the relevant briefing schedule (ECF No. 533) shall be filed on or before August 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/13/18. (dlg)
GPO Mar 26 2019
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in Part Bona Fide's 561 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Mary Karen Wills; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 521 SourceAmerica's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Kevin M. Jans; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 575 SourceAmerica's Motion to Strike Declarations of Kevin M. Jans. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/26/19. (dlg)
GPO Mar 26 2019
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 527 SourceAmerica's Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/26/19. (dlg)
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, June 27, 2019
632 632 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 06/27 8:27 AM
ORDER Granting Joint631 Motion to Dismiss Amended and Supplemental Complaints and Amended Counterclaims, With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/27/19. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
631 631 motion Dismiss Wed 06/26 8:37 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Amended and Supplemental Complaints and Amended Counterclaims, with Prejudice by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc., Ruben Lopez. (Ergastolo, Joseph) (dlg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
630 630 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 06/25 1:44 PM
ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to extend the day to file the joint stipulation to dismiss (EF No.629 ) is granted. The parties must file it by June 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/25/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2019
629 629 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 06/24 4:40 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Dismiss by SourceAmerica. (Goodman, Joseph)
Related: [-]