CABRERA et al v. BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Loren L Alikhan |
Referred: | Zia M Faruqui |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-03833 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 18:2331 Anti-terrorism Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 24, 2020 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CENTERRA GROUP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAI GLOBAL LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ENVIRONMENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G4S HOLDINGS INTERNATIONAL (AG) LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G4S RISK MANAGEMENT LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANUS GLOBAL OPERATIONS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. / BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION JOINT VENTURE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MTN (DUBAI) LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MTN AFGHANISTAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MTN GROUP LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BLUMONT GLOBAL DEVELOPMENT, INC.
|
|
Defendant
BLUMONT, INC.
|
|
Defendant
CHEMONICS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
|
|
Defendant
INTERNATIONAL RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
JOHN DAVID ANDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES BOUCHER, SR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARGARET ANDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALMA MURPHY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAUL MURPHY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VIRGINIA NEWSOM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARMANDO OCHOA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EDUARDO OCHOA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LINDA PHANEUF
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JD PROSSER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LINDSAY REDOUTEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERIN RIEDEL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREA ROE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHERYL ATWELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
E.B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L.B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L.G.A
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M.G.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
R.X.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S.B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAITLIN ELIZABETH ANDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BOBBY JOE ANDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BOBBY GENE ANDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
APRIL LYNN ANDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAMELA E. ALEXANDER BELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LUCAS GONZALES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES MICHAEL BOUCHER, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AUGUST CABRERA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CORBIN CABRERA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GILLIAN LEIGH CABRERA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT CABRERA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BETHANY ANN BENTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FREDERICK C. BENSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LONDON JACINDA BELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANGELA FRITZGES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES BELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY LEE BAYS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER BALDRIDGE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PATRICIA MARLENE GOODWIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRENDA GRINER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRAD JOSEPH HALLIDAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROSA IRMA HALLIDAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
APRIL ANGEL BAYS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GINNY LAMB
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHERRY LOAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRETT BARRETT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KYLE BALDUF
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSIE BALDRIDGE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SUZANNE RENAE MARTINEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BEVERLY MILLS
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
MICHAEL DAVITT
Terminated: 02/21/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, January 17, 2025 | ||
196 | 196
![]() NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MTN GROUP LIMITED, MTN (DUBAI) LIMITED, MTN AFGHANISTAN. Attorney Scott A. Eisman terminated. (Eisman, Scott) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2025 | ||
195 | 195
![]() NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BLUMONT, INC.. Attorney Paul R. Monsees terminated. (Monsees, Paul) |
|
194 | 194
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Alexandra I. Russell by LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC. / BLACK & VEATCH SPECIAL PROJECTS CORPORATION JOINT VENTURE, LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC., LOUIS BERGER INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Russell, Alexandra) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 01/10 2:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants The Louis Berger Group, Inc. and Louis Berger International, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel194 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Alexandra I. Russell shall be withdrawn as counsel. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 01/10/2025. (lclla1) |