Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gary Spraker
Case #: 3:19-bk-51486
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Feb 03, 2020
Claims Deadline:May 04, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Jan 22, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ESSEX REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC
3495 Lakeside Dr PMB 62
Reno, NV 89509-4841
Represented By
STEPHEN R HARRIS
Harris Law Practice LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
823 823 5 pgs misc Request for Judicial Notice Wed 05/21 3:54 PM
Amended Request for Judicial Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by ALAN R SMITH on behalf of FURTHER SOUTH, LLC fka FURTHEST SOUTH, LLC (SMITH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
822 822 5 pgs misc Request for Judicial Notice Wed 05/21 11:30 AM
Request for Judicial Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by ALAN R SMITH on behalf of FURTHER SOUTH, LLC fka FURTHEST SOUTH, LLC (SMITH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
821 821 7 pgs answer Objection Tue 05/20 3:37 PM
Objection with Certificate of Service Filed by FREDERICK A SANTACROCE on behalf of RESOURCE INVESTORS CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC, TENRAB LIMITED PARTNERSHIP Related [+] (SANTACROCE, FREDERICK)
Related: [-] 709 Motion to Distribute Funds/Proceeds filed by Interested Party GEORGE F. HOLMAN, Interested Party KIRKLAND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATES, LLC, Interested Party MJH IRREVOCABLE TRUST, Interested Party GFH IRREVOCABLE TRUST.
Att: 1 170 pgs Exhibit
820 820 19 pgs misc Document Tue 05/20 10:23 AM
Document [PROPOSED] FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION DIRECTING DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING PROCEEDS Filed by JEFFREY L HARTMAN on behalf of GFH IRREVOCABLE TRUST, GEORGE F. HOLMAN SR., KIRKLAND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATES, LLC, MJH IRREVOCABLE TRUST Related [+] (HARTMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 709 Motion to Distribute Funds/Proceeds filed by Interested Party GEORGE F. HOLMAN, Interested Party KIRKLAND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATES, LLC, Interested Party MJH IRREVOCABLE TRUST, Interested Party GFH IRREVOCABLE TRUST
Monday, May 19, 2025
819 819 3 pgs misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Mon 05/19 3:22 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by FREDERICK A SANTACROCE on behalf of RESOURCE INVESTORS CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC, TENRAB LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (SANTACROCE, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
818 818 3 pgs order Order (generic) (BK) Fri 05/16 2:10 PM
Order Setting Oral Argument On Kirkland Membership Briefing Related [+] (mms)
Related: [-] 709 Motion to Distribute Funds/Proceeds filed by Interested Party GEORGE F. HOLMAN, Interested Party KIRKLAND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATES, LLC, Interested Party MJH IRREVOCABLE TRUST, Interested Party GFH IRREVOCABLE TRUST.
Thursday, May 15, 2025
817 817 27 pgs answer Reply Thu 05/15 3:56 PM
Reply with Certificate of Service Filed by FREDERICK A SANTACROCE on behalf of ANTHONY PUSATERI (SANTACROCE, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Exhibit