Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:19-cv-05774
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2019
Terminated:Apr 03, 2020

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
misc Fee Payment Received Wed 01/11 3:02 PM
Filing Fee Paid: $21.90, receipt number 100000896. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
misc Fee Payment Received Mon 12/05 2:43 PM
Filing Fee Payment Received: $ 30.00, receipt number 100000047. (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
misc Fee Payment Received Thu 11/03 2:02 PM
Filing Fee Payment Received: $ 43.00, receipt number GAN100142130. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
misc Fee Payment Received Wed 10/05 10:06 AM
Filing Fee Payment Received in the amount of $35.00, receipt number GAN100141444. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
misc Fee Payment Received Wed 09/07 10:37 AM
Filing Fee Payment Received: $ 67.40, receipt number GAN100140805. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
misc Fee Payment Received Wed 08/03 12:17 PM
Filing Fee Payment Received: $ 20.00, receipt number GAN100140093 (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
misc Fee Payment Received Thu 07/07 11:24 AM
Filing Fee Payment Received: $51.00, receipt number GAN100139416 (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
misc Fee Payment Received Tue 05/31 2:58 PM
Filing Fee Payment Received: $ 37.00, receipt number GAN100138650 (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
misc Fee Payment Received Thu 05/05 12:17 PM
Filing Fee Payment Received: $ 44.70, receipt number GAN100138031 (tas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
12 12 misc Judgment - Clerk Fri 04/03 2:28 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action for failure to state a claim. (jed)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Fri 04/03 2:18 PM
ORDER: The Court receives the7 Report and Recommendation with approval and adopts its findings and legal conclusions as the Opinion of this Court. Accordingly, Petitioner's3 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action in its records. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/3/2020. (jed)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/03 9:17 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Javonte Nunez re10 Notice (Other). (jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/03 2:29 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Javonte Nunez re11 Order on Final Report and Recommendation,12 Clerk's Judgment. (jed)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 04/03 2:37 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/02 9:52 AM
Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 03/24 10:14 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Javonte Nunez re9 Order. (ah)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 03/24 10:13 AM
General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ah)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 03/13 8:30 AM
Submission of7 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
8 8 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Mon 02/24 3:17 PM
ORDER for Service of7 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/24/20. (rlb)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Mon 02/24 3:12 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the3 Amended Complaint be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/24/20. (rlb)
Related: [-]
order Order ruling on IFP ~Util - Directing Warden to Collect Monthly Payments from Inmate Mon 02/24 3:15 PM
ORDER: plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis6 is GRANTED, and plaintiff need not pay an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall, however, be obligated to pay the full statutory filing fee of $350.00 as funds are deposited in his inmate account. The Clerk SHALL transmit a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification State Prison in Jackson, Georgia. The Warden, or his designee, shall collect the aforesaid monthly payments from plaintiffs inmate account and remit such payments to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, allowing Plaintiff to proceed IFP, however, Plaintiff is obligated to pay $350.00 as funds are deposited into Inmate account. The Warden or the designee shall collect the monthly payments and remit to Clerk until $350.00 is paid in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/24/20 within7 R&R. (rlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/24 3:18 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Javonte Nunez re7 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and8 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/24 3:19 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to the Warden of GA Diagnostic and State Prison re7 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and8 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account Fri 02/21 10:32 AM
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Javonte Nunez. (rlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/18 10:53 AM
Submission of5 Order,to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (rlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
5 5 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Directing Payment of the Filing Fee Mon 01/27 10:39 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's4 request to proceed in forma pauperis does not include his financial affidavit and a signed authorization allowing his custodian to withdraw funds from his inmate account. Plaintiff must, within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the date of this order, either submit the full filing and administrative fee of $400.00, or execute and return a financial affidavit seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a signed authorization allowing his custodian to withdraw funds from his inmate account. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to forward the appropriate financial affidavit to plaintiff together with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/24/20. (rlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Forms Sent Mon 01/27 10:41 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Javonte Nunez re5 Order and Forms sent to party: Affidavit and Authorization; (rlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/22 12:41 PM
Submission of2 Order,4 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (rlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
4 4 misc Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account Wed 01/22 12:39 PM
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Javonte Nunez (form received by Court without the first two pages). (rlb)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/22 12:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Governer: Brian P. Kemp, executive administrator: Judge Shawn Ellen Lagrua, District Attorney: Paul Howard Jr, Assistant District Attorney: Kevin T. McMurry, Detective: Andre Lowe II, Mr. Herbert Adams Jr filed by Javonte Nunez.(rlb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
2 2 order ~Util - Forms Sent Order Thu 01/02 2:22 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit an amended complaint within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to stamp the civil action number on a standard 42 U.S.C. § 1983 civil action form and forward the form and the appropriate financial affidavit to plaintiff, together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the assigned Magistrate Judge upon receipt of the amended complaint and full filing and administrative fee or affidavit or at the expiration of the time period Forms sent to party: Affidavit and Authorization; 42:1983 Forms; Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/2/20. (rlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/02 2:24 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Javonte Nunez re2 Order. (rlb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 12/27 2:49 PM
Submission of1 Complaint to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker for IFP review. (aaq)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/27 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Javonte Nunez.(aaq)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet