ARMSTRONG v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-05075 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-03016 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 27, 2020 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
KURTIS ARMSTRONG
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago |
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by KURTIS ARMSTRONG. (ROGIERS, ERIN) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KURTIS ARMSTRONG (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 09/26 2:50 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: REMINDER - See 3:19-md-02885-MCR-GRJ ECF No. 763 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17. re: Voluntary Dismissals. "Any Plaintiff who wishes to voluntarily dismiss any case filed in or transferred to this MDL must comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)." Case will not be dismissed at this time. (djb) |
||
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by KURTIS ARMSTRONG. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under § 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION to Remand to State Court by KURTIS ARMSTRONG. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of KURTIS ARMSTRONG (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 01/03 8:02 AM
Set Deadlines re13 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/16/2020) ). (MB) |
||
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended Short Form Complaint due by 1/21/2020 .) (djb) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-03016. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MTP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/30/2019.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-3016 JRT/BRT. (MTP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/30/2019.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |