YOUNG v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-05076 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-03018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 27, 2020 6:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL YOUNG
1341 LOLA DR
TALLAHASSEE, FL 32301 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/17 9:33 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by MICHAEL YOUNG. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
17
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/23 2:08 PM
AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under § 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Remand to State Court
Thu 01/02 7:47 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by MICHAEL YOUNG. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/02 7:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of MICHAEL YOUNG (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 01/03 8:05 AM
Set Deadlines re12 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/16/2020) ). (MB) |
||
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 12/30 9:33 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended Short Form Complaint due by 1/21/2020 .) (djb) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Mon 12/30 9:31 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-03018. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-44) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/30/2019.] | |
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/30/2019.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/30/2019.] | |
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/30/2019.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-3018 WMW/HB. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/30/2019.] | |
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/30/2019.] | |
2 | 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/30/2019.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7312874) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |