Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Timothy L Brooks
Referred: Mark E Ford
Case #: 5:19-cv-05241
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2019
Terminated:Sep 21, 2020

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, October 05, 2020
28 28 misc Mail Returned Mon 10/05 1:30 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS Unable to Forward. Mail originally sent to Dillon Carter at Benton County Detention Center including27 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Order - Memo. No new address available. (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order - Memo Mon 09/21 2:39 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Dismiss Case (CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE); finding as moot26 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 21, 2020. (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
26 26 motion Dismiss Case Extension of Time to File Document Fri 08/21 11:30 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case or Alternatively , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by MacKenzie Fisk, Nadia Malpha, Shawna Stephens. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(Jackson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
25 25 misc Mail Returned Mon 08/17 1:29 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked no longer here. Mail originally sent to Dillon Carter at Benton County Jail including24 Notice of Change of Address. No new address available. New Address due by 9/16/2020. (lgd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 08/05 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Dillon Carter to Benton County Detention Center. There are no documents to resend. (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order Directing Response Thu 07/23 10:22 AM
ORDER GRANTING22 Motion to Compel ; ORDER DIRECTING the Plaintiff to provide required responses by by 8/6/2020 (See Order for details). Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 23, 2020. (lgd)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 07/23 10:23 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Document due in Response to Order by 8/6/2020 (lgd)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
22 22 motion Compel Mon 06/22 12:16 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiff by MacKenzie Fisk, Nadia Malpha, Shawna Stephens. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(Jackson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/13 9:49 AM
NOTICE by MacKenzie Fisk, Nadia Malpha, Shawna Stephens (Jackson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
20 20 order Initial Scheduling Order - PC cases Mon 03/30 11:52 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached document for complete deadline information. Summary Judgment Motion due by 8/27/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 30, 2020. (djm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 03/27 10:03 AM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint, by MacKenzie Fisk, Nadia Malpha, Shawna Stephens.(Jackson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
18 18 misc Mail Returned Wed 03/11 12:46 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS Inmate no longer here. Mail originally sent to Dillon Carl Carter at Benton County Jail including15 Summons Issued,14 Order Directing Service. Resent to Texarkana. (lgd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/10 12:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dillon Carl Carter. MacKenzie Fisk served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Nadia Malpha served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Shawna Stephens served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 02/28 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Dillon Carter to Texarkana, AR. There are no documents to resend. (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
15 15 service Summons Issued Wed 02/26 12:48 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to MacKenzie Fisk, Nadia Malpha, Shawna Stephens and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re 13 Amended Complaint, 14 Order Directing Service, 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order Directing Service Wed 02/26 12:11 PM
ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE MacKenzie Fisk, Nadia Malpha, Shawna Stephens and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 26, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/24 1:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against Shawna Stephens, filed by Dillon Carl Carter. Related document:1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Dillon Carl Carter.(lgd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 02/21 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Dillon Carter to Benton County, AR. There are no documents to resend. (lgd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
11 11 2 pgs order Order Directing Pleading to be Filed Mon 02/03 12:22 PM
ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. Amended Complaint due by 2/24/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 3, 2020. (src)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
10 10 misc Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee Thu 01/30 10:04 AM
CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Warden, Southwest Arkansas Community Correction Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $16.80; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (tg)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Thu 01/30 9:01 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on January 30, 2020. (gg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Wed 01/29 3:10 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on January 29, 2020. (cpg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
7 7 misc Mail Returned Mon 01/27 1:10 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS no longer here. Mail originally sent to Dillon Carter at Benton County Detention including1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Dillon Carl Carter,5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) filed by Dillon Carl Carter. Resent to DCC Texarkana, AR. (lgd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 01/17 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Dillon C. Carter to Texarkana, AR. There are no documents to resend. (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Wed 01/15 11:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Dillon Carl Carter. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2019
4 4 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Mon 12/30 2:10 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Furnished. (tg)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order - PC Complaint 42:1983 - Initial Order Directing Pleading to be Filed Mon 12/30 2:04 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to file the in forma pauperis (IFP) application and complaint submitted by the Plaintiff. A determination regarding his status as a pauper and service of process will be made at a later time. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of his new address , ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed IFP be filed.( Completed IFP due by 1/15/2020). Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on December 30, 2019. (tg)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Mon 12/30 1:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Dillon Carl Carter. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Referred (42:1983) Mon 12/30 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against MacKenzie Fisk, Nadia Malpha, Shawna Stephens, filed by Dillon Carl Carter.(tg)
Related: [-]