Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Judith E Levy
Referred: R Steven Whalen
Case #: 5:19-cv-13808
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2019
Terminated:Jun 07, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 27, 2020 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
New Center Stamping, Inc.
Represented By
John J. O'Shea
Law Office Of John J. O'Shea, P.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Kettles
Represented By
Ryan Thomas Fowler
Batley Law Firm
contact info
Scott P. Batey
Batey Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, June 07, 2021
26 26 order Judgment* Mon 06/07 9:09 AM
JUDGMENT, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 06/07 9:09 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
minutes Motion Hearing Thu 06/03 7:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2021 re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by New Center Stamping, Inc.; Disposition: Motion granted (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
24 24 notice Hearing on Motion* Mon 05/24 2:52 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on19 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1607618171?pwd=WVRLUlkrWkFvb0lwaUdPS3pnRFhmdz09 Passcode: 491109 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1607618171# or +16468287666,,1607618171#| (WBar)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/19 3:08 PM
REPLY to Response re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (O'Shea, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Unreported Case,
Att: 3 Exhibit Termination List,
Att: 4 Exhibit Excerpts of Ruth Warhurst Deposition
Monday, April 05, 2021
22 22 misc Statement of Resolved and Unresolved Issues Mon 04/05 3:55 PM
STATEMENT of Resolved and Unresolved Issues Plaintiff's Counter-Statement of Disputed Facts re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Scott Kettles (Batey, Scott)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/05 3:53 PM
RESPONSE to19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Kettles. (Batey, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Termination List No. 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Termination List No. 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Deposition of Ray Fernandez,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Edward White,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Deposition of Scott Kettles,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Ethelinds Henry,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Deposition of Ethelinds Henry,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Affidavit of John Rostron,
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Cameron Delmotte,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Deposition of Ruth Warhurst,
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Request for Admissions,
Att: 13 Exhibit L - April 12 Termination Letter,
Att: 14 Exhibit M - Affidavit of Ray Fernandez,
Att: 15 Exhibit N - Affidavit of Tolaria Johnson,
Att: 16 Exhibit O - Affidavit of Angela Russo,
Att: 17 Exhibit P - Affidavit of Frank Garrett
Monday, March 15, 2021
20 20 notice Hearing on Motion* Mon 03/15 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING on19 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Mon 03/15 2:07 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (O'Shea, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Excerpts of Plaintiff's Deposition,
Att: 4 Exhibit Excerpts of Ethelinds Henry Deposition,
Att: 5 Exhibit Termination List,
Att: 6 Exhibit Affidavit of Tolaria Johnson,
Att: 7 Exhibit Excerpts of Ruth Warhurst Deposition,
Att: 8 Exhibit 3/13/19 Email correspondence,
Att: 9 Exhibit Affidavit of Angela Russo,
Att: 10 Exhibit Excerpts of Ray Fernandez Deposition,
Att: 11 Exhibit 3/19/19 Email correspondence,
Att: 12 Exhibit 3/28/19 Email correspondence,
Att: 13 Exhibit Affidavit of Frank Garrett
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
18 18 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 02/02 11:58 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Extending Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline; Dispositive Motion Cut-off reset for 3/15/2021, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
17 17 notice Appear* Wed 10/14 2:43 PM
AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference reset for 1/14/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen . PLEASE SEE NOTICE FOR ADDITIONAL IMPORTANT INFORMATION. (THac)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 10/14 11:54 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Adjourning Settlement Conference to Mid-January 2021 and Extending Scheduling Order Dates; Discovery due by 1/29/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/1/2021 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2021 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy , Jury Trial set for 8/23/2021 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy ) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Wed 10/14 12:02 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Settlement Conference on 10/15/2020 is Cancelled re15 Notice to Appear - ***TO BE RESET*** (CCie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
15 15 notice Appear* Thu 03/26 11:34 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen . PLEASE SEE NOTICE FOR ADDITIONAL IMPORTANT INFORMATION. (THac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
14 14 order Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge* Wed 03/25 4:57 PM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Whalen : Settlement Conference in Mid-October 2020. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/25 4:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/30/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 12/30/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2021 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Jury Trial set for 6/21/2021 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. Related [+] (WBar)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 03/25 2:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/25/2020 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (WBar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
12 12 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Thu 03/19 10:18 AM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (O'Shea, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
11 11 notice Appear* Mon 03/16 11:29 AM
AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy ***PLEASE USE THE FOLLOWING CALL-IN INFORMATION: (888) 363-4734; Access Code: 2541474*** (WBar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
10 10 notice Appear* Wed 02/26 2:34 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Case Management Status and Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
9 9 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 02/12 3:57 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by New Center Stamping, Inc. (O'Shea, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 3:55 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (O'Shea, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Tue 02/11 3:10 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Dismissing Count I, Only, of1 Complaint, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
6 6 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/07 11:31 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 2/12/2020, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
5 5 notice Appearance Wed 02/05 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Fowler on behalf of Scott Kettles. (Fowler, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance Wed 02/05 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John J. O'Shea on behalf of All Defendants. (O'Shea, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
3 3 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/29 11:40 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. New Center Stamping, Inc. served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (Batey, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 12/30 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *New Center Stamping, Inc.* (ATee)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 12/30 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Scott Kettles against New Center Stamping, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7541546 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Batey, Scott)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 12/30 3:15 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (ATee)
Related: [-]