Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-05101
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-03082
Last checked: Sunday Jun 28, 2020 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Dechert Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Represented By
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Dechert Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Represented By
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Dechert Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Represented By
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Dechert Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Represented By
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Dechert Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
MARK J NOMELLINI
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Dechert Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JONATHON FRIEL
Represented By
JEFF H ECKLAND
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
JARED M REAMS
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
VINCE C REUTER
Eckland & Blando - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, October 01, 2020
20 20 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Fri 10/02 8:04 AM
ORDER. Plaintiffs' motions to remand are DENIED. All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs are now reinstated as to Plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2020. (sdw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
19 19 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Tue 04/07 12:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court Declaration of Vince C. Reuter filed by JONATHON FRIEL. (REUTER, VINCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
18 18 28 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 04/07 12:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JONATHON FRIEL. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Remand to State Court Tue 04/07 12:07 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by JONATHON FRIEL. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/08 7:57 AM
Set Deadlines as to17 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/21/2020) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/21 1:55 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JONATHON FRIEL. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of JONATHON FRIEL (REAMS, JARED)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of JONATHON FRIEL (REUTER, VINCE)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of JONATHON FRIEL (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2019
12 12 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/31 10:41 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Short Form Complaints (Amended) due by 1/21/2020 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 12/31 10:16 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-03082. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2019
10 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-46) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2019
9 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 3M Occupational Safety LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Holding LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Holding LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Holding LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Intermediate LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Intermediate LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Intermediate LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. Aearo LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Holding LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Occupational Safety LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Company. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (MKB). [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE by Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-3082 DWF/ECW. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7336413) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet